Jean v. Staffs in Federals Bureau of Prison of Lee County Facility
Plaintiff: Rick Jean
Defendant: Staffs in Federals Bureau of Prison of Lee County Facility
Case Number: 7:2020cv00415
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Oral ORDER-It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for an extension of time (Dkt. No. 14) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint not later than October 21, 2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/11/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Rick Jean. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (aab)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 THIRD NOTICE of Change of Address by Rick Jean. (aab)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 DUPLICATE NOTICE of Change of Address as to by Rick Jean (aab)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rick Jean: USP Thomson, P.O. Box 1002, Thomson, Illinois 61285. Clerk resending #10 Order to Plaintiff at updated address. (aab)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with an Amended Complaint within 30 days. Responses due by 9/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Rick Jean (slt)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 28 USC Section 1331 Bivens Act; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/6/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 Response re #6 Letter regarding future address change . (aab)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 Letter regarding future address change by Rick Jean (aab)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Rick Jean (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(aab)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Letter regarding if civil rights forms were received by the court by Rick Jean. Clerk sending docket sheet. (aab)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 28 USC Section 1331 Bivens Act; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 8/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 7/20/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Rick Jean (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(aab)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 28 USC 1331 Bivens Act against Staffs in Federals Bureau of Prison of Lee County Facility, filed by Rick Jean. Documents are an accurate depiction of the paper documents received by the clerk-illegible. Plaintiff wrote documents in pencil. (aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jean v. Staffs in Federals Bureau of Prison of Lee County Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staffs in Federals Bureau of Prison of Lee County Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?