Boxley v. Hutcheson et al
Plaintiff: Earl Boxley
Defendant: Rockingham-Harrisonburg VA Jail, Timmy Wimer, Bryan F. Hutcheson and Lt. Madison
Case Number: 7:2020cv00429
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 9/22/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 9/22/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 22, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Earl Boxley. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ck)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Earl Boxley. Clerk updating docket sheet to reflect new address of 1423 Mt. Clinton Pike Harrisonburg, VA 22802. (ck)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with full filing fee or otherwise respond within 10 days Responses due by 9/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/3/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Earl Boxley 353 Summit Street, Harrisonburg, VA 24011(tvt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ORAL NOTICE of Change of Address by Earl Boxley - released and provided address as updated to party this day. Instructed to write in formally w/ same and provided case # and mailing address of clerk's office. (ssm)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 8/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/28/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Bryan F. Hutcheson, Madison, Rockingham-Harrisonburg VA Jail, Timmy Wimer, filed by Earl Boxley. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boxley v. Hutcheson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockingham-Harrisonburg VA Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmy Wimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan F. Hutcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Boxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?