Garrett v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Debra Garrett
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Wal-Mart Supercenter and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP a Delaware limited partnership doing business as Wal-Mart Supercenter
Case Number: 7:2020cv00475
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 22, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) #If this is a video conference click here for guidance re: participation via Zoom Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2020 10:00 AM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (mka)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 Scheduling Letter (mka)
August 24, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - located at Docket Entry #6 State Court Record at page# 33 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc.. (aab)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Paper State Court Records received from Wythe County Circuit Court, CL20-898, consisting of 1 Volume, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (aab)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Wythe County Circuit Court. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/13/2020. (dg)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (dg)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (dg)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. (dg)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wythe County Circuit Court, case number CL20-898. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3460159), filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Wal-Mart Supercenter
Represented By: Victor S. Skaff, III
Represented By: C. Kailani Memmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP a Delaware limited partnership doing business as Wal-Mart Supercenter
Represented By: Victor S. Skaff, III
Represented By: C. Kailani Memmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Garrett
Represented By: Mark T. Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?