Pulling et al v. Arms et al
Plaintiff: Angel Cartagena, Lion J. Ross, Justin Evans and Tyler Pulling
Defendant: Dr. Parham, Dr. William Lee, A. Lovell, Christopher Arms, Tori Raiford and Dr. D. Haynes
Case Number: 7:2020cv00482
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
2 Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 27 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Lion J. Ross (aab)
October 6, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Change of Address and request to proceed in forma pauperis by Tyler Pulling (676 Buckner, Road, Bumpass, VA 23024) (tvt)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice as to LION J. ROSS. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 9/30/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 30, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 9/30/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER dismissing case as to ANGEL CARTAGENA. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 9/29/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 29, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION as to ANGEL CARTAGENA . Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 9/29/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt) Modified on 9/29/2020-added plaintiff's name to docket text. (slt).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice as to TYLER PULLING. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 9/29/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt) Modified on 9/29/2020-added plaintiff's name to docket text. (slt).
September 29, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION as to TYLER PULLINGS. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 9/29/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt) Modified on 9/29/2020-added plaintiff's name to docket text. (slt).
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 Prisoner Trust Account Report and statement of Assets by Lion J. Ross (tvt)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER dismissing JUSTIN EVANS from this action. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 9/24/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION as to JUSTIN EVANS. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 9/24/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 22, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Thomas T. Cullen for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(tvt)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee regarding ANGEL CARTAGENA; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 9/4/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 DUPLICATE Prisoner Trust Account Report by Tyler Pulling (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(aab)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Angel Cartagena (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(aab)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; as to LION J. ROSS Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 8/31/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee as to TYLER PULLING; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 8/31/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lion J. Ross. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (aab)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Lion J. Ross. (aab)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Tyler Pulling. (aab)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding (JUSTIN EVANS)- Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 8/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding (ANGEL CARTAGENA)-Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 8/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding (LION J. ROSS)- Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 8/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding (TYLER PULLING)-Prisoner Trust Account; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 8/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Assets by Tyler Pulling (aab)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Christopher Arms, D. Haynes, William Lee, A. Lovell, Parham, Tori Raiford, filed by Angel Cartagena, Lion J. Ross, Justin Evans, Tyler Pulling. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pulling et al v. Arms et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Cartagena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lion J. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Pulling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. William Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Arms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tori Raiford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. D. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?