Guyer v. Chess et al
Plaintiff: James W. Guyer
Defendant: Englander Transportation, Inc. and Patrick Virgil Chess
Case Number: 7:2020cv00486
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/16/2021-11/19/2021 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. All nondispositive pretrial motions and issues are hereby referred to United StatesMagistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 10/05/2020. (ams)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) #If this is a video conference click here for guidance re: participation via Zoom Final Pretrial Conference set for November 9, 2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Jury Trial set for November 16-19, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Roanoke before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (mf)
September 22, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 In Chambers Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Status Conference held by conference call on 9/18/2020. (bwd)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Patrick Virgil Chess on 08.15.2020, filed by James W. Guyer.(Smith, Charles)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) #If this is a video conference click here for guidance re: participation via Zoom Rule 16 Status Conference set for September 18, 2020 at 10:30 AM BY CONFERENCE CALL before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (Chambers sent the dial-in information to the parties.)(mf)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 Scheduling Letter (bwd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Paper State Court Records received from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, CL20001633-00, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (ams)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Montgomery County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 08/18/2020. (ams)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Englander Transportation, Inc. (Tracy, Amy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Patrick Virgil Chess, Englander Transportation, Inc..(Tracy, Amy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Requirement to Englander Transportation, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ck)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (ck)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Circuit Court, case number CL20001633-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt #0423-3463094), filed by Patrick Virgil Chess, Englander Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guyer v. Chess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Englander Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Stephen Setliff
Represented By: Amy Lynn Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Virgil Chess
Represented By: Charles Stephen Setliff
Represented By: Amy Lynn Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Guyer
Represented By: Caley Amber DeGroote
Represented By: Charles H. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?