Jones v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Plaintiff: James Perry Jones
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 7:2020cv00487
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 Prisoner Trust Account Report by James Perry Jones (slt)
September 16, 2020 Filing 18 Response re #16 Request for Copies .. (slt)
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 Letter regarding Judge on case by James Perry Jones. (slt)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 Letter requesting copies of all filings by James Perry Jones. (slt)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 Letter by James Perry Jones regarding sending Prisoner Trust Account. (slt)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 9/8/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 9/8/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff James Perry Jones (slt)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 Letter asking the Court to sanction a dentist after he's released by James Perry Jones (tvt)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff James Perry Jones (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(tvt)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 Response re #8 Letter .. (slt)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 Letter regarding sending payments to the court for filing fee by James Perry Jones. (slt)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 28 USC Section 1331 Bivens Act; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/25/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Account Report by James Perry Jones (slt)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Additional Civil Complaint / Evidence re #1 Complaint by James Perry Jones (slt)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Letter regarding six month statements by James Perry Jones (slt)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 28 USC Section 1331 Bivens Act; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/17/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Assets by James Perry Jones (tvt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1331 Bivens Act against Federal Bureau of Prisons, filed by James Perry Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tvt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Perry Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?