Moyer v. Hoffert et al
Plaintiff: Byron A. Moyer
Defendant: Robert D. Russell and Robert Hoffert
Case Number: 7:2020cv00546
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Byron A. Moyer. (slt)
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: re #12 Opinion, #13 Order Dismissing Case regarding Bryon A. Moyer; (No forwarding address given) (tvt)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/20/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 OPINION. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/20/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with full filing fee or otherwise respond within 10 days Responses due by 10/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/6/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
October 6, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Byron A. Moyer. Updated address: Roanoke Rescue Mission, 402 4th ST., SE, Roanoke, VA 24013 (slt)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 Response re #8 Notice of Change of Address .. (slt)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 FUTURE NOTICE of Change of Address by Byron A. Moyer. (slt)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 Letter regarding pauper status by Byron A. Moyer. (slt)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) by Byron A. Moyer (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(slt)
September 22, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 Response to future change of address re #2 letter .. (slt)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account for August;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/10/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) by Byron A. Moyer (slt)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 Letter with future change of address by Byron A. Moyer. (slt)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Robert Hoffert, Robert D. Russell, filed by Byron A. Moyer. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moyer v. Hoffert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hoffert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron A. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?