Penaloza et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Diaz, Frank Anthony Diaz-Navarro, Matthew Penaloza, Richard Mendoza, Marquil D. Ball, Earnest Martinez, Boyd Phillips and Trevor Jackson
Defendant: B. Parson, B. Parker, D. Hughes, J.C. Streeval, M. Hamilton, Unknown Bailey, United States of America and Unknown Kimmerman
Case Number: 7:2020cv00558
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00825. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 16, 2020 Certified Copy of Order Transferring Case to Other District #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Trevor Jackson, Richard Mendoza, Frank Anthony Diaz-Navarro, Boyd Phillips, Earnest Martinez, Carlos Diaz, Matthew Penaloza, Marquil D. Ball (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/16/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Virginia; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/16/2020.]
September 15, 2020 ***Pro Se Staff notes: draft order for transfer sent to Judge Kent (CH) (Pro Se Dept, jmr). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Copy of Notice Regarding Reassignment of Referral Judge After Recusal #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Trevor Jackson, Richard Mendoza, Frank Anthony Diaz-Navarro, Boyd Phillips, Earnest Martinez, Carlos Diaz, Matthew Penaloza, Marquil D. Ball (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent after Order of Recusal #2 ; case is no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Green (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Copy of Order of Recusal #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Trevor Jackson, Richard Mendoza, Frank Anthony Diaz-Navarro, Boyd Phillips, Earnest Martinez, Carlos Diaz, Matthew Penaloza, Marquil D. Ball (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/16/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green recused from this case; case to be reassigned; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/16/2020.]
September 3, 2020 ***Pro Se Department pre-screening is complete; draft order transferring the case sent to Judge Green (CH). ***Set PROSEMOTION flag (CH) Clear PROSEPRESCREEN flag (Pro Se Dept, jmr) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/16/2020.]
August 28, 2020 ***Notify Pro Se Department of possible action needed re prescreening matter; multi-plaintiff case (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/16/2020.]
August 27, 2020 ***Staff notes: Zero copies of a complaint received from filer (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/16/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Trevor Jackson, Richard Mendoza, Frank Anthony Diaz-Navarro, Boyd Phillips, Earnest Martinez, Carlos Diaz, Matthew Penaloza, Marquil D. Ball (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penaloza et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Anthony Diaz-Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Penaloza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquil D. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boyd Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Parson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Streeval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?