Higgs v. The Pavilion at Williamsburg
Plaintiff: Darryl John Joseph Higgs, Jr.
Defendant: The Pavilion at Williamsburg
Case Number: 7:2020cv00590
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 DETAILS: Case transferred from Virginia Western has been opened in Eastern District of Virginia - as case 1:20-cv-01179, filed 10/08/2020. (slt)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order transferring case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 10/7/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Darryl John Joseph Higgs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(ck)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against The Pavilion at Williamsburg, filed by Darryl John Joseph Higgs, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgs v. The Pavilion at Williamsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl John Joseph Higgs, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pavilion at Williamsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?