Cowles v. McCoy et al
Plaintiff: Clint Devin Cowles
Defendant: Lt. Dye, Sgt. Horne, Officer Stifler, The Mador, Lt. Cole, Kevin McCoy, Sgt. Hobson, Officer Casey, Sgt. McCallister, Charolette Shelton, Officer Browning, Jordan McCoy, Sgt. Blackenship, Sgt. McClain and Chief of Housing and Programs
Case Number: 7:2020cv00615
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Reopen Case. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to docket this order and the entirety of Dkt. No. 22 (including attachments) as the original complaint in a new civil case. (SEE#721cv00368) Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 6/16/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
June 3, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Reopen Case by Clint Devin Cowles. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope)(slt)
April 7, 2021 Filing 20 Request for Copies by Clint Devin Cowles. (ams)
March 19, 2021 Filing 19 Response re #18 Request for Copies filed by Clint Devin Cowles. (aab)
March 19, 2021 Filing 18 Request for Copies by Clint Devin Cowles (aab)
March 19, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Clint Devin Cowles: 5797 Centerville Road, Williamsburg, Virginia 23188 (aab)
January 26, 2021 Filing 16 Response re #15 Letter regarding how to proceed with case filed by Clint Devin Cowles. (aab)
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 Letter regarding how to proceed with case by Clint Devin Cowles. (aab)
January 5, 2021 Filing 14 Response re #13 Letter regarding how to refile claims and if court received inmate account information filed by Clint Devin Cowles. (aab)
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 Letter regarding how to refile claims and if court received inmate account information by Clint Devin Cowles. (aab)
December 14, 2020 Filing 12 Response re #11 Request for Copies . (aab)
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Copies by Clint Devin Cowles (aab)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 Letter regarding inmate account information by Clint Devin Cowles (tvt)
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) by Clint Devin Cowles (slt)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 11/19/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 Statement of Assets by Clint Devin Cowles (aab)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 "Things that Happen since Arriving at Wallens Ridge" filed by Clint Devin Cowles (aab)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Clint Devin Cowles. Updated address: Wallens Ridge State Prison, PO Box 759, Big Stone Gap, VA 24219. (Clerk re-mailing DE#4 to updated address.) (slt)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/19/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 Verified Statement by Plaintiff Clint Devin Cowles (aab)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clint Devin Cowles. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (aab)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Blackenship, Browning, Casey, Chief of Housing and Programs, Cole, Dye, Hobson, Horne, McCallister, McClain, Jordan McCoy, Kevin McCoy, Charolette Shelton, filed by Clint Devin Cowles. (Attachments: #1 Individuals Involved, #2 Attachments, #3 Cover Letter)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowles v. McCoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Stifler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Hobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. McCallister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charolette Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Blackenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Housing and Programs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Devin Cowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?