Al-Mutawakkil v. Andrews et al
Plaintiff: Hanif K. Al-Mutawakkil
Defendant: Erika Young, J. Andrews and F.B.O.P-Health Services
Case Number: 7:2020cv00679
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 DETAILS: Case transferred from Virginia Western has been opened in Eastern District of Virginia - as case 3:20-cv-00880, filed 11/18/2020. (slt)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order transferring case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 11/17/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 Verified Statement by Plaintiff Hanif K. Al-Mutawakkil (slt)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Hanif K. Al-Mutawakkil (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(slt)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hanif K. Al-Mutawakkil. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (slt)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1331 Bivens Act against J. Andrews, F.B.O.P-Health Services, Erika Young, filed by Hanif K. Al-Mutawakkil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Mutawakkil v. Andrews et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.B.O.P-Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanif K. Al-Mutawakkil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?