Gordon v. Blue Mountain Therapy, LLC
Plaintiff: Jarel Cole Gordon
Defendant: Blue Mountain Therapy, LLC
Case Number: 7:2020cv00692
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jarel Cole Gordon. Blue Mountain Therapy, LLC waiver sent on 12/18/2020, answer due 2/16/2021.(Strelka, Thomas)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Blue Mountain Therapy, LLC, filed by Jarel Cole Gordon.(Strelka, Thomas)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Blue Mountain Therapy, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ams)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Mountain Therapy, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt number AVAWDC-3551847.), filed by Jarel Cole Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Blue Mountain Therapy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarel Cole Gordon
Represented By: Norvell Winston West, IV.
Represented By: Brittany Michelle Haddox
Represented By: Linda Leigh Strelka
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Strelka
Represented By: Monica Lynn Mroz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Mountain Therapy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?