United States of America v. Persinger et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Melissa H. Persinger and Jeffrey L. Persinger
Case Number: 7:2020cv00767
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Jeffrey L. Persinger waiver sent on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021.(Kalyniuk, Alexander)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Melissa H. Persinger waiver sent on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021.(Kalyniuk, Alexander)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeffrey L. Persinger, Melissa H. Persinger NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Summons Issued as to Melissa Persinger)(sln) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/23/2020) (sln). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/23/2020) (sln). Modified on 12/23/2020 (sln).Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey L. Persinger, Melissa H. Persinger, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Persinger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa H. Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L. Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander Kalyniuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?