Roscoe v. Engelke et al
Plaintiff: Emmitt G. Roscoe
Defendant: Marie M. Vargo, Nartarcha Gregg, Malissa Welch, Jane and or John Doe #1, David Robinson, John Doe #3, John Doe #2, P. Scarberry and Mark E. Engelke
Case Number: 7:2021cv00005
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 Clerks Notice of Service (OAG 1983) sent to Mark E. Engelke, et al on 3/2/2021. Pursuant to the agreement of electronic service. Waiver of Service due by 4/1/2021.(slt)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order entered Directing the Clerk to attempt service of process upon the named defendants Jane and or John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Mark E. Engelke, Nartarcha Gregg, David Robinson, P. Scarberry, Marie M. Vargo, Malissa Welch re #1 Complaint, filed by Emmitt G. Roscoe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 3/2/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Emmitt G. Roscoe (aab)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 2/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/1/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/1/2021) (slt). Modified on 2/1/2021-replaced document with correct PDF (slt).
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Account Report and statement of Assets by Emmitt G. Roscoe. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(aab)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/6/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Jane and or John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Mark E. Engelke, Nartarcha Gregg, David Robinson, P. Scarberry, Marie M. Vargo, Malissa Welch, filed by Emmitt G. Roscoe. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roscoe v. Engelke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie M. Vargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nartarcha Gregg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malissa Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and or John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Scarberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Engelke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmitt G. Roscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?