Blum v. Saul
Plaintiff: Gerald M. Blum
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 7:2021cv00041
Filed: January 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerald M. Blum. Andrew Saul served on 2/2/2021, answer due 6/2/2021.(Geddes, Amy)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (ams)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to the United States Attorney, #2 Summons Issued as to the United States Attorney General)(ams)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If needed, forms may also be found at #www.vawd.uscourts.gov/forms.aspx Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 1/25/2021. (ams)
January 24, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Gerald M. Blum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)
January 24, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gerald M. Blum. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blum v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald M. Blum
Represented By: Amy Hansen Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?