Spates v. Department of the United States Treasury
Plaintiff: Maceo A. Spates
Defendant: Department of the United States Treasury
Case Number: 7:2021cv00048
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT. Spates may file an amended complaint within thirty days if he believes he can revise his complaint to address the deficiency identified by the court. If he does not file an amended complaint within thirty days, the case will be struck from the active docket of the court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 2/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (Opinion and Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Maceo A. Spates. (slt)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons by Maceo A. Spates (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slt)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 2/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/26/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maceo A. Spates. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (slt)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report and statement of Assets by Maceo A. Spates (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(slt)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1331 Bivens action against Department of the United States Treasury, filed by Maceo A. Spates. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Affidavit)(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spates v. Department of the United States Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the United States Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maceo A. Spates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?