Hening v. Adair
Plaintiff: Kiersten Hening
Defendant: Charles Chugger Adair
Case Number: 7:2021cv00131
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kiersten Hening. Charles Chugger Adair waiver sent on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021.(Norris, Cameron)
March 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam K. Mortara on behalf of Kiersten Hening (Mortara, Adam)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Adam K. Mortara to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 3/5/2021. (ams)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Adam K. Mortara to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3644966. by Kiersten Hening. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Norris, Cameron)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles "Chugger" Adair (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 AVAWDC-3642699), filed by Kiersten Hening. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hening v. Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiersten Hening
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Represented By: Adam K. Mortara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Chugger Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?