Priest et al v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: Mary Eleanor Priest and James Harold Priest
Defendant: Brandon David Harris and Big Fam Enterprises, L.L.C.
Respondent: Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins. Co, Erie Insurance Exchange and Erie Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2021cv00174
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou: Telephone Conference held on 5/14/2021. (cd)
May 10, 2021 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 Scheduling Order,,, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge,, by Erie Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins. Co. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Bentley, Lori)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Status Conference set for 12/6/2021 10:00 AM in Roanoke before Judge Thomas T. Cullen., Jury Trial set for 4/4-6/2022 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. All nondispositive pretrial motions and issues are hereby referred to Honorable Judge Robert S. Ballou, United States Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 4/29/2021. (aab)
April 26, 2021 Filing 22 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Plaintiffs James Harold Priest, Mary Eleanor Priest (Russell, Anthony)
April 26, 2021 Filing 21 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Erie Insurance Exchange (Bentley, Lori)
April 26, 2021 Filing 20 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Erie Insurance Company (Bentley, Lori)
April 15, 2021 Filing 19 Respondent's ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Erie Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange.(Bentley, Lori)
April 15, 2021 Filing 18 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins. Co (Bentley, Lori)
April 15, 2021 Filing 17 Respondent's ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins. Co.(Bentley, Lori)
April 2, 2021 Filing 16 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Big Fam Enterprises, L.L.C. (Moyers, Jason)
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Filing Requirement to Big Fam Enterprises, L.L.C. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (aab)
April 2, 2021 Filing 14 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (aab)
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Big Fam Enterprises, L.L.C., Brandon David Harris.(Moyers, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Harold Priest, Mary Eleanor Priest re #9 Return of Service per N.C.G.S. 1A-1, Rule 4 (Russell, Anthony)
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Harold Priest, Mary Eleanor Priest re #10 Return of Service per Va. Code section 8.01-296(2)(b) (Russell, Anthony)
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of service of Brandon David Harris on 03/30/2021 upon Brandon David Harris(Russell, Anthony)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of service of Big Fam Enterprises, L.L.C. on 03/27/2021 upon John T. Bobbit, Jr., its registered agent(Russell, Anthony)
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of service of Erie Insurance Company on 03/25/2021 upon Sue Waldron, natural person appointed by its registered agent(Russell, Anthony)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of service of Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company on 03/26/2021 upon Marc Strohecker, the natural person appointed by its registered agent(Russell, Anthony)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Big Fam Enterprises, L.L.C., Brandon David Harris NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brandon David Harris, #2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, #3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Erie Insurance Company)(aab)
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Erie Insurance Company by James Harold Priest, Mary Eleanor Priest (Russell, Anthony)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company by James Harold Priest, Mary Eleanor Priest (Russell, Anthony)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Brandon David Harris by James Harold Priest, Mary Eleanor Priest (Russell, Anthony)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Big Fam Enterprises, L.L.C. by James Harold Priest, Mary Eleanor Priest (Russell, Anthony)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Big Fam Enterprises, L.L.C., Brandon David Harris (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402. Receipt # AVAWDC-3657190), filed by Mary Eleanor Priest, James Harold Priest. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Priest et al v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Eleanor Priest
Represented By: Anthony Marc Russell
Represented By: Les S. Bowers
Represented By: Linda Leigh Strelka
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Strelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Harold Priest
Represented By: Anthony Marc Russell
Represented By: Les S. Bowers
Represented By: Linda Leigh Strelka
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Strelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon David Harris
Represented By: Jason Guy Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Fam Enterprises, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jason Guy Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins. Co
Represented By: Lori J. Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Erie Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Lori J. Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Erie Insurance Company
Represented By: Lori J. Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?