Fletcher v. Unnamed
Plaintiff: Alasia Rochelle Fletcher
Defendant: Unnamed and Warden Maria Lefevers
Case Number: 7:2021cv00231
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maria Lefevers, filed by Alasia Rochelle Fletcher.(aab)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with an Amended Complaint within 21 days. Alternatively, if Fletcher no longer wants to pursue the claim raised in this case or if she needs additional time to prepare an amended complaint, she may voluntarily dismiss this case and refile her claims in a new case, subject to the applicable statute of limitations. Responses due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 5/28/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Alasia Rochelle Fletcher (tvt)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 6/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 5/14/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Alasia Rochelle Fletcher (tvt)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 5/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/22/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Verified Statement by Plaintiff Alasia Rochelle Fletcher (aab)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Alasia Rochelle Fletcher (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(aab)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Unnamed, filed by Alasia Rochelle Fletcher.(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fletcher v. Unnamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alasia Rochelle Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Maria Lefevers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?