Cellcontrol, Inc. v. Mill Mountain Capital, LLC
Plaintiff: Cellcontrol, Inc.
Defendant: Mill Mountain Capital, LLC
Case Number: 7:2021cv00246
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
2 Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2021 02:00 PM in via Zoom before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (mka)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Scheduling Conference set for 8/4/2021 03:30 PM in via Zoom before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (mka)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Scheduling Letter (mka)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Mill Mountain Capital, LLC. (Long, Joshua)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Mill Mountain Capital, LLC. (Long, Joshua)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mill Mountain Capital, LLC answer due 6/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 5/27/2021. (ams)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Oral Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou for case management. Motions referred to Robert S. Ballou. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/27/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(kab)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Joseph Donovan on behalf of Cellcontrol, Inc. (Donovan, Thomas)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mill Mountain Capital, LLC (Long, Joshua)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas T. Cullen no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 5/25/2021. (ck)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Mill Mountain Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Long, Joshua)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua F.P. Long on behalf of Mill Mountain Capital, LLC (Long, Joshua)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Hagedorn on behalf of Cellcontrol, Inc. (Hagedorn, Mark)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Mark A. Hagedorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 5/24/2021. (ams)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Thomas J. Donovan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 5/24/2021. (ams) Modified on 5/24/2021 to add attorney name to docket text (ams).
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Mark A. Hagedorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3702143. by Cellcontrol, Inc.. (Steele, Erin)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Thomas J. Donovan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3702140. by Cellcontrol, Inc.. (Steele, Erin)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cellcontrol, Inc.. Mill Mountain Capital, LLC served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Steele, Erin)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mill Mountain Capital, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ams)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Summons by Cellcontrol, Inc. (Steele, Erin) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/4/2021) (ams). Modified on 5/4/2021 (ams). Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cellcontrol, Inc. (Steele, Erin)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by the Clerk. (ams)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing Requirement to Cellcontrol, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ams)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mill Mountain Capital, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-3687136), filed by Cellcontrol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cellcontrol, Inc. v. Mill Mountain Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mill Mountain Capital, LLC
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellcontrol, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Steele
Represented By: Mark Hagedorn
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?