Shipp v. Punturi et al
Plaintiff: Mark Joseph Shipp
Defendant: Warden K.T. Punturi, Lieutenant Bogle, Captain Neal, Correctional Officer Craig, Correctional Officer Scott and Unit Manager D. Hammond
Case Number: 7:2021cv00414
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bogle, Craig, D. Hammond, Neal, K.T. Punturi, Scott. (Summons and 6 copies of complaint along with receipt# 700068932 mailed to Plaintiff at address on docket)(aab)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 Clerk's Office Response re #5 Letter with questions regarding order at docket no. #2 . (aab)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 Letter with questions regarding order at docket no. #2 by Mark Joseph Shipp (aab)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Oral Order Vacating #2 Conditionally filed Order-Plaintiff has paid the entire filing fee and the Order entered at Docket No. 2 is hereby VACATED. Because plaintiff is not proceeding in forma pauperis, plaintiff is responsible for serving defendant(s) and shall have 90 (ninety) days from the date of this order to accomplish service. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide plaintiff with the procedural instructions for service, as well as copies of basic service documents. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 7/21/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 VACATED Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 8/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 7/20/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt) Modified on 7/21/2021 (slt).
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bogle, Craig, D. Hammond, Neal, K.T. Punturi, Scott (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402., receipt# 700068737), filed by Mark Joseph Shipp. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shipp v. Punturi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Joseph Shipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden K.T. Punturi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Bogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Manager D. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?