Jahangiri v. Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Wali Jahangiri, M.D.
Defendant: Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC doing business as Lewis-Gale Medical Center
Case Number: 7:2021cv00427
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Jury Trial set for 6/27-30/2022 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.), Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/21/21. (mka)
September 21, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2021 09:00 AM in via Zoom before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (mka)
September 21, 2021 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Status Conference held on 9/21/2021. (mka)
September 17, 2021 Filing 16 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Brief in Opposition to Partial Motion to Dismiss Title VII Retaliation Claim and Part of Breach of Contract Claim. filed by Wali Jahangiri, MD. (Haddox, Brittany)
September 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2021 09:30 AM in via Zoom before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (mka)
September 3, 2021 Filing 14 Scheduling Letter (mka)
September 3, 2021 Filing 13 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (mka)
September 3, 2021 Filing 12 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, by Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC.(North, Susan)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Oral ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC answer due 9/3/2021. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/27/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC identifying Corporate Parent HCA Squared, LLC, Corporate Parent HCA Healthcare, Inc., Corporate Parent Healthtrust, Inc.-The Hospital Company, Corporate Parent HCA Inc., Corporate Parent Hospital Corp., LLC, Corporate Parent Lewis-Gale Hospital, Incorporated for Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, . filed by Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Warren Gonzalez on behalf of Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Childers North on behalf of Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC (North, Susan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Katie Bush, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent on 07/30/21, filed by Wali Jahangiri, MD.(Haddox, Brittany)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(sln)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402, Receipt number AVAWDC-375559.), filed by Wali Jahangiri, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln) Modified on 7/29/2021 (sln).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jahangiri v. Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wali Jahangiri, M.D.
Represented By: Brittany Michelle Haddox
Represented By: Linda Leigh Strelka
Represented By: Monica Lynn Mroz
Represented By: Norvell Winston West, IV.
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Strelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC doing business as Lewis-Gale Medical Center
Represented By: Susan Childers North
Represented By: Jonathan Warren Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?