SAFE HAVEN WILDLIFE REMOVAL AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT EXPERTS, LLC v. MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: SAFE HAVEN WILDLIFE REMOVAL AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT EXPERTS, LLC
Defendant: MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC doing business as MERIDIAN BIRD REMOVAL, INC.
Case Number: 7:2021cv00577
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue : (CR) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Motion Hearing set for February 8, 2022 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (The parties anticipate needing 1 hour for this hearing.)(mf)
December 30, 2021 Filing 36 Second Reply re #33 Brief / Memorandum in Support, #34 Order Surreply. filed by SAFE HAVEN WILDLIFE REMOVAL AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT EXPERTS, LLC. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
December 22, 2021 Filing 35 In Chambers Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Status Conference held by conference call on 12/22/2021. (bwd)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave To File a Surreply by January 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/22/2021. (sln)
December 17, 2021 Filing 33 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue . filed by MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hearn, David)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORAL ORDER granting #28 MOTION for Lauren Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/01/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(ams)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORAL ORDER granting #27 MOTION for Siraj Abhyankar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/01/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(ams)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/01/2021. (ams)
December 1, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim by MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hearn, David)
December 1, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Lauren Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3842463. by MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Hearn, David)
December 1, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Siraj Abhyankar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3842452. by MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Hearn, David)
November 29, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) Rule 16 Status Conference set for December 22, 2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone conference before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (Chambers sent the dial-in information to the parties by email.)(mf) Modified on 11/30/2021 to correct the date. (mf).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORAL ORDER finding as moot #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on November 29, 2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mf)
November 26, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue . filed by SAFE HAVEN WILDLIFE REMOVAL AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT EXPERTS, LLC. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due by 11/29/2021. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 11/16/21. (sln)
November 16, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue by SAFE HAVEN WILDLIFE REMOVAL AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT EXPERTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitzgerald, Andrew)
November 10, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by David Christopher Tait on behalf of MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC (Tait, David)
November 10, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Hearn on behalf of MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC (Hearn, David)
November 8, 2021 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:21-cv-00525. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. on 11/8/2021. The parties' Joint Motion to Transfer (Doc. #13 ) is GRANTED and this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia Roanoke Division pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1400. The Clerk shall take all necessary steps to effectuate the transfer. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
November 5, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue filed by MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff Kuhland In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(GRIFFIN, LAUREN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
November 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue by MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/19/2021 (GRIFFIN, LAUREN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
November 4, 2021 Motion Submitted re: #13 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case, to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. (Welch, Kelly) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
November 4, 2021 Motion Referred re: #15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint (Unopposed), to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Welch, Kelly) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
November 2, 2021 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint,,,,, (Unopposed) by MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GRIFFIN, LAUREN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint for MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC. Answer due by 11/5/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/5/2021. (Brubaker, John) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint,,,,, by MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GRIFFIN, LAUREN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by SAFE HAVEN WILDLIFE REMOVAL AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT EXPERTS, LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FITZGERALD, ANDREW) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 9/24/2021; that Defendant's motion to dismiss, (Doc. #9 ), is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs, filed by SAFE HAVEN WILDLIFE REMOVAL AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT EXPERTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Meridian job post, #2 Exhibit Meridian web site services, #3 Exhibit Meridian web site service area, #4 Exhibit '374 patent, #5 Exhibit '108 patent, #6 Exhibit Meridian claim of patent process, #7 Exhibit Fitz letter May 21, 2019, #8 Exhibit Alston July 19 reply to Fitz, #9 Exhibit Meridian web site claiming patent process, #10 Exhibit Meridian social media with telescoping pole, #11 Exhibit Meridian social media with telescoping pole, #12 Exhibit Meridian social media with trapping net, #13 Exhibit Meridian social media with tel pole and mist net, #14 Exhibit '683 band, #15 Exhibit Sarasota per net, pulley, hook, pole, #16 Exhibit Sarasota flushing into per net, #17 Exhibit Sarasota hook, tel pole, pulley, per net, #18 Exhibit Sarasota hook, tel pole, pulley, per net, #19 Exhibit Sarasota picture sack or bag, #20 Exhibit Sarasota picture flushing, #21 Exhibit Sarasota picture flushing, #22 Exhibit Sarasota picture flushing into per net, #23 Exhibit Sarasota flushing device with bag / sack, #24 Exhibit Sarasota Meridian shirt with "scary bag man", #25 Exhibit Sarasota pic pulley, per mist net, hook,)(FITZGERALD, ANDREW) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue filed by MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff Kuhland in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(GRIFFIN, LAUREN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue by MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/28/2021 (GRIFFIN, LAUREN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC. (GRIFFIN, LAUREN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney LAUREN N. GRIFFIN on behalf of Defendant MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC (GRIFFIN, LAUREN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by SAFE HAVEN WILDLIFE REMOVAL AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT EXPERTS, LLC. MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
June 28, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAFE HAVEN WILDLIFE REMOVAL AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT EXPERTS, LLC. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3075724), filed by SAFE HAVEN WILDLIFE REMOVAL AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT EXPERTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13) (FITZGERALD, ANDREW) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAFE HAVEN WILDLIFE REMOVAL AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT EXPERTS, LLC v. MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAFE HAVEN WILDLIFE REMOVAL AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT EXPERTS, LLC
Represented By: Andrew L. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERIDIAN WILDLIFE SERVICES, LLC doing business as MERIDIAN BIRD REMOVAL, INC.
Represented By: David W. Hearn
Represented By: David Christopher Tait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?