Norman v. Leonard's Express, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yvette Norman
Defendant: Leonard's Express, Inc. and Julian J. Kaczor
Case Number: 7:2022cv00096
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Leonard's Express, Inc. (Grace, Kathryn)
March 31, 2022 Filing 9 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendants Julian J. Kaczor, Leonard's Express, Inc. (Grace, Kathryn)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/17/2023 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Judge Thomas T. Cullen., Jury Trial set for 5/22/2023-5/26/2023 at 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.) All nondispositive pretrial motions and issues are hereby referred to the Honorable Judge Robert S. Ballou, United States Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 3/30/22. (ams)
March 1, 2022 Filing 7 Certified True Copies of State Court Record(s) received electronically from Circuit Court for the City of Roanoke, case number(s) CL21-2736. (ams)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Julian J. Kaczor, Leonard's Express, Inc..(Grace, Kathryn)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leonard's Express, Inc. (Grace, Kathryn) Modified on 3/1/2022 (ams) to correct event used.
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from the Circuit Court for the City of Roanoke. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 2/22/2022. (ams)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Requirement to Leonard's Express, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ams)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (ams)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the City of Roanoke, case number CL21-2736. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-3892880), filed by Leonard's Express, Inc., Julian J. Kaczor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Records: Service documents and complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 State Court Records: Pleadings/Orders Detail, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams) Modified on 2/22/2022 to correct typo in docket text (ams).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Leonard's Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Norman
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Kyber
Represented By: Jonathan T. Wren
Represented By: Kevin Wayne Mottley
Represented By: Robert Emmet Byrne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard's Express, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian J. Kaczor
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?