Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. v. Goad et al
Plaintiff: Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C.
Defendant: Dr. Bradley J. Goad, Dr. Jeffrey Garland, Carrie Burnette, GAPS Health, Premier Geriatric Solutions, PLLC, GAPS Health NC, PLLC, Elite Practice Management & Consulting LLC, Dr. Vanessa Jean Sturgill Fant, Dr. David Campbell, Dr. Victor Bell, Jessi Dalton, Matthew Fife, Jamie Wood Smith, Lisa Elmore Curtis, Arneda F. Lyons, Holly Hullett Roy, Stacy Johnson Gambill, Farrah Russell Vaughn, Ashley Cupp, Amanda Lanier, Ryan Carlton, Viola Jones, Jessica L. Van Auken, Michie Bolden, Natasha Obrist and Candace Young
Case Number: 7:2022cv00199
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORAL ORDER granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 7/8/2022. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/24/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)
May 24, 2022 Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Matthew Fife. (Munro, Devon)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORAL ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/19/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)
May 19, 2022 Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Michie Bolden. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Munro, Devon)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORAL ORDER granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, , #1 Complaint,,, GAPS Health answer due 7/8/2022; GAPS Health NC, PLLC answer due 7/8/2022. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/18/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)
May 18, 2022 Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by GAPS Health, GAPS Health NC, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walton, David)
May 18, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Walton on behalf of GAPS Health, GAPS Health NC, PLLC (Walton, David)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORAL ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, , #1 Complaint,,, Carrie Burnette answer due 7/8/2022; Elite Practice Management & Consulting LLC answer due 7/8/2022. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/17/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)
May 17, 2022 Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Carrie Burnette, Elite Practice Management & Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Catherine)
May 17, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Jackson Huff on behalf of Carrie Burnette, Elite Practice Management & Consulting LLC (Huff, Catherine)
May 17, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Pietro Francesco Sanitate on behalf of Victor Bell, David Campbell, Ryan Carlton, Ashley Cupp, Lisa Elmore Curtis, Jessi Dalton, Stacy Johnson Gambill, Bradley J. Goad, Viola Jones, Arneda F. Lyons, Natasha Obrist, Premier Geriatric Solutions, PLLC, Holly Hullett Roy, Jamie Wood Smith, Vanessa Jean Sturgill Fant, Jessica L. Van Auken, Farrah Russell Vaughn, Candace Young (Long, Joshua) Presiding Judge: Urbanski , Michael F. (Sanitate, Pietro) Docket text was modified to reflect the correct defendants representing. Modified on 5/19/2022 (sln).
May 16, 2022 Filing 57 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/25/2022 upon Ashley Cupp(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 56 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/25/2022 upon Dr. David Campbell(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 55 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/25/2022 upon Lisa Elmore Curtis(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 54 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/28/2022 upon Candace Young(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 53 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/29/2022 upon Jamie Wood Smith(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 52 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/28/2022 upon Viola Jones(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 51 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/26/2022 upon Holly Hullett Roy(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 50 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/28/2022 upon Natasha Obrist(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 49 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/28/2022 upon Michie Bolden(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 48 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/27/2022 upon Jessica L. Van Auken(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 47 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/27/2022 upon Ryan Carlton(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 46 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/29/2022 upon Dr. Victor Bell(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 45 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/28/2022 upon Farrah Russell Vaughn(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 44 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/26/2022 upon Arneda F. Lyons(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 43 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/28/2022 upon Jessi Dalton(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 42 RETURN of service of Complaint on 5/2/2022 upon Stacy J. Gambill(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 41 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/26/2022 upon Dr. Vanessa Jean Sturgill Fant(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 40 RETURN of service of Complaint on 5/2/2022 upon Elite Practice Management & Consulting LLC(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 39 RETURN of service of Complaint on 5/2/2022 upon Carrie Burnette(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 38 RETURN of service of Complaint on 5/3/2022 upon Matthew Fife(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 37 RETURN of service of Complaint on 5/5/2022 upon GAPS Health NC, PLLC(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 36 RETURN of service of Complaint on 5/5/2022 upon GAPS Health(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 35 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/25/2022 upon Dr. Bradley J. Goad(Edwards, Gary)
May 16, 2022 Filing 34 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/22/2022 upon Premier Geriatric Solutions, PLLC(Edwards, Gary)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORAL ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond, #1 Complaint, Victor Bell, David Campbell, Ryan Carlton, Ashley Cupp, Lisa Elmore Curtis, Jessi Dalton, Stacy Johnson Gambill, Bradley J. Goad, Viola Jones, Arneda F. Lyons, Natasha Obrist, Premier Geriatric Solutions, PLLC, Holly Hullett Roy, Jamie Wood Smith, Vanessa Jean Sturgill Fant, Jessica L. Van Auken, Farrah Russell Vaughn, Candace Young. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/10/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka) Modified on 5/10/2022 to list parties individually (mka).
May 10, 2022 Filing 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond by Victor Bell, David Campbell, Ryan Carlton, Ashley Cupp, Lisa Elmore Curtis, Jessi Dalton, Stacy Johnson Gambill, Bradley J. Goad, Viola Jones, Arneda F. Lyons, Natasha Obrist, Premier Geriatric Solutions, PLLC, Holly Hullett Roy, Jamie Wood Smith, Vanessa Jean Sturgill Fant, Jessica L. Van Auken, Farrah Russell Vaughn, Candace Young. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Long, Joshua)
May 10, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua F.P. Long on behalf of Victor Bell, David Campbell, Ryan Carlton, Ashley Cupp, Lisa Elmore Curtis, Jessi Dalton, Stacy Johnson Gambill, Bradley J. Goad, Viola Jones, Arneda F. Lyons, Natasha Obrist, Premier Geriatric Solutions, PLLC, Holly Hullett Roy, Jamie Wood Smith, Vanessa Jean Sturgill Fant, Jessica L. Van Auken, Farrah Russell Vaughn, Candace Young (Long, Joshua)
May 3, 2022 Filing 30 RETURN of service of Complaint on 4/22/2022 upon Premier Geriatric Solutions, PLLC(Edwards, Gary)
April 14, 2022 Filing 29 Electronic Summons Issued as to Dr. Bradley J. Goad, NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: Electronic Summons' also Issued as to: #1 Jeffrey Garland, #2 Carrie Burnette, #3 GAPS Health, #4 Premier Geriatric Solutions, PLLC, #5 GAPS Health NC, PLLC, #6 Elite Practice Management & Consulting LLC, #7 Dr. Vanessa Jean Sturgill Fant, #8 Dr. David Campbell, #9 Dr. Victor Bell, #10 Jessi Dalton, #11 Matthew Fife, #12 Jamie Wood Smith, #13 Lisa Elmore Curtis, #14 Arneda F. Lyons, #15 Holly Hullett Roy, #16 Stacy Johnson Gambill, #17 Farrah Russell Vaughn, #18 Ashley Cupp, #19 Amanda Lanier, #20 Ryan Carlton, #21 Viola Jones, #22 Jesasica L. Van Auken, #23 Michie Bolden, #24 Natasha Obrist, #25 Candace Young)(sln)
April 13, 2022 Filing 28 Proposed Summons for Candace Young by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 27 Proposed Summons for Natasha Obrist by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 26 Proposed Summons for Michie Bolden by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 25 Proposed Summons for Jessica L. Van Auken by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 24 Proposed Summons for Viola Jones by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 23 Proposed Summons for Ryan Carlton by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 22 Proposed Summons for Amanda Lanier by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 21 Proposed Summons for Ashley Cupp by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 20 Proposed Summons for Farrah Russell Vaughn by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 19 Proposed Summons for Stacy J. Gambill by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 18 Proposed Summons for Holly Hullett Roy by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 17 Proposed Summons for Arneda F. Lyons by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 16 Proposed Summons for Lisa Elmore Curtis by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 15 Proposed Summons for Jamie Wood Smith by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 14 Proposed Summons for Matthew Fife by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 13 Proposed Summons for Jessi Dalton by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 12 Proposed Summons for Dr. Victor Bell by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 11 Proposed Summons for Dr. David Campbell by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 10 Proposed Summons for Dr. Vanessa Jean Sturgill Fant by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Summons for Elite Practice Management & Consulting LLC by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Summons for GAPS Health NC, PLLC by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Summons for Premier Geriatric Solutions, PLLC by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons for GAPS Health by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Carrie Burnette by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Dr. Jeffrey Garland by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Dr. Bradley J. Goad by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (Edwards, Gary)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. (sln) Modified date filed on 4/8/2022 (sln).
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Victor Bell, Michie Bolden, Carrie Burnette, David Campbell, Ryan Carlton, Ashley Cupp, Lisa Elmore Curtis, Jessi Dalton, Elite Practice Management & Consulting LLC, Matthew Fife, GAPS Health, GAPS Health NC, PLLC, Stacy Johnson Gambill, Jeffrey Garland, Bradley J. Goad, Viola Jones, Amanda Lanier, Arneda F. Lyons, Natasha Obrist, Premier Geriatric Solutions, PLLC, Holly Hullett Roy, Jamie Wood Smith, Vanessa Jean Sturgill Fant, Jessica L. Van Auken, Farrah Russell Vaughn, Candace Young (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC -3925913.), filed by Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C. v. Goad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inpatient Consultants Of North Carolina, P.C.
Represented By: Gary L. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Bradley J. Goad
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jeffrey Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Burnette
Represented By: Catherine Jackson Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAPS Health
Represented By: David J. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Geriatric Solutions, PLLC
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAPS Health NC, PLLC
Represented By: David J. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Practice Management & Consulting LLC
Represented By: Catherine Jackson Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Vanessa Jean Sturgill Fant
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. David Campbell
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Victor Bell
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Dalton
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Fife
Represented By: Devon J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Wood Smith
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Elmore Curtis
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arneda F. Lyons
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Hullett Roy
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Johnson Gambill
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farrah Russell Vaughn
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Cupp
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Carlton
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viola Jones
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica L. Van Auken
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michie Bolden
Represented By: Devon J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Obrist
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace Young
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Represented By: Pietro Francesco Sanitate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?