James v. Delta Motors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tamron James
Defendant: Delta Motors, LLC and Austin's Auto Service, LLC
Case Number: 7:2022cv00441
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Delta Motors, LLC and Austin's Auto Service, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Summons Issued as to Austin's Auto Service, LLC)(sln)
September 6, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Austin's Auto Service, LLC by Tamron James (Woodward, Henry) Modified on 9/7/2022 Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document (sln). (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/7/2022) (sln).
September 6, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Delta Motors LLC by Tamron James (Woodward, Henry) Modified on 9/7/2022 Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document (sln). (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/7/2022) (sln).
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If needed, forms may also be found at #www.vawd.uscourts.gov/forms.aspx Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/3/22. (slt)
August 2, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Austin's Auto Service, LLC, Delta Motors, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-4002167.), filed by Tamron James. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) #2 Exhibit) (slt). Modified on 8/4/2022-Complaint and exhibits replaced due to defective pdf. (slt).
August 2, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tamron James. (slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Delta Motors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamron James
Represented By: Emily Faye Jewett
Represented By: Henry Lavinder Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin's Auto Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?