Luxe Properties, LLC et al v. West et al
Plaintiff: Luxe Properties, LLC, Jennifer M. West and Levi Dickenson, LLC
Defendant: DJRC, LLC, Travis Schaffer, LLC, Daniel West, DJ-CP, LLC, DJ-RC, LLC, DJ-MT, LLC, Castle Farms, LLC, Lubna2055, LLC, Alison Carroll, LLC, HHL Rentals 2, LLC, HHL Rentals 3, LLC, HHL Rentals 4, LLC, HHL Rentals 5, LLC, HHL Rentals 6, LLC, HHL Rentals 7, LLC, HHL Rentals, LLC, KL Rentals 2, LLC, KL Rentals, LLC, Oak Tree Professional Park, LLC, OTB Rentals 7-2, LLC, OTB Rentals 7, LLC, OTB7 Rentals 2, LLC, OTB7 Rentals, LLC, Paige Oats, LLC, Patrick Oakley, LLC, Paul Overton, LLC, Pauline Owens, LLC, Penny Osborne, LLC, Percy Bedford, LLC, Perry Oliver, LLC, Petra O'Brien, LLC, Peyton Burke, LLC, Phillip Odom, LLC, Preston O'Neil, LLC, Tabitha Sexton, LLC, Tammie Oxley, LLC, Tara Sullivan, LLC, Tate Otto, LLC, Taylor Singleton, LLC, Teddy Shelton, LLC, Tegan Olsen, LLC, Teresa Oak, LLC, Tesla Overcash, LLC, Thad Schmitt, LLC, Theo Otterman, LLC, Thomas Ostrom, LLC, Tiffany Overstreet, LLC, Timothy O'Keefe, LLC, TOB Rentals 10, LLC, TOB Rentals 8, LLC, TOB Rentals 9, LLC, TOB8 Rentals 2, LLC, TOB8 Rentals, LLC, TOB9 Rentals, LLC, Tobias Simpson, LLC, Tony Steele, LLC, Tracey Sutton, LLC, Trenton Oxford, LLC, Trey Stevenson, LLC, Tristan Oakland, LLC, Troy Saunders, LLC, Ty Shae, LLC and Tyler Sawyer, LLC
Case Number: 7:2022cv00648
Filed: November 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORAL ORDER granting in part and denying in part #64 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing conducted on January 3, 2023, the court denies the motion to dismiss Counts I, II, and III of the state court complaint. The court grants the motion to dismiss as to Count VII. Plaintiff Luxe Properties, LLC is granted leave to file an Amended Complaint on or before January 23, 2023. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 1/6/23. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORAL ORDER granting #75 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nathaniel Stuart Shepherd terminated. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 1/4/2023. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)
January 3, 2023 Filing 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2023 re #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Preston O'Neil, LLC, Paige Oats, LLC, OTB Rentals 7-2, LLC, Tegan Olsen, LLC, HHL Rentals, LLC, Trey Stevenson, LLC, Lubna2055, LLC, TOB9 Rentals, LLC, Oak Tree Professional Park, LLC, TOB8 Rentals, LLC, DJ-MT, LLC, Tate Otto, LLC, Theo Otterman, LLC, Paul Overton, LLC, Thomas Ostrom, LLC, Tracey Sutton, LLC, Tobias Simpson, LLC, Timothy O'Keefe, LLC, Tyler Sawyer, LLC, Trenton Oxford, LLC, DJ-CP, LLC, Travis Schaffer, LLC, Penny Osborne, LLC, Teddy Shelton, LLC, Castle Farms, LLC, Tristan Oakland, LLC, Ty Shae, LLC, Pauline Owens, LLC, KL Rentals, LLC, Alison Carroll, LLC, TOB Rentals 10, LLC, HHL Rentals 2, LLC, Troy Saunders, LLC, Thad Schmitt, LLC, Daniel West, Taylor Singleton, LLC, Tara Sullivan, LLC, DJRC, LLC, OTB7 Rentals, LLC, TOB8 Rentals 2, LLC, Patrick Oakley, LLC, Tony Steele, LLC, HHL Rentals 4, LLC, Teresa Oak, LLC, HHL Rentals 7, LLC, OTB Rentals 7, LLC, Percy Bedford, LLC, Phillip Odom, LLC, Tiffany Overstreet, LLC, HHL Rentals 3, LLC, OTB7 Rentals 2, LLC, TOB Rentals 9, LLC, Petra O'Brien, LLC, HHL Rentals 5, LLC, Tammie Oxley, LLC, Perry Oliver, LLC, Peyton Burke, LLC, TOB Rentals 8, LLC, Tesla Overcash, LLC, KL Rentals 2, LLC, HHL Rentals 6, LLC, Scheduling Conference held on 1/3/2023(). Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Sindie Bragg) (mka)
January 3, 2023 Filing 76 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Houchens, Aaron)
December 30, 2022 Filing 75 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Shepherd, Nathaniel) by Luxe Properties, LLC, Jennifer M. West. (Shepherd, Nathaniel)
December 28, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Constance Ingles on behalf of Luxe Properties, LLC, Jennifer M. West (Ingles, Sarah)
December 23, 2022 Filing 73 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings)( Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2023 03:00 PM in via Zoom before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski.), NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings)( Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2023 03:00 PM in via Zoom before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski.) (mka)
December 13, 2022 Filing 72 Scheduling Letter (mka)
December 9, 2022 Filing 71 Reply re #70 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition . filed by Alison Carroll, LLC, DJ-CP, LLC, DJ-MT, LLC, DJRC, LLC, HHL Rentals 2, LLC, HHL Rentals 3, LLC, HHL Rentals 4, LLC, HHL Rentals 5, LLC, HHL Rentals 6, LLC, HHL Rentals 7, LLC, HHL Rentals, LLC, KL Rentals 2, LLC, KL Rentals, LLC, OTB Rentals 7, LLC, OTB Rentals 7-2, LLC, OTB7 Rentals 2, LLC, OTB7 Rentals, LLC, Oak Tree Professional Park, LLC, Paige Oats, LLC, Patrick Oakley, LLC, Paul Overton, LLC, Pauline Owens, LLC, Penny Osborne, LLC, Percy Bedford, LLC, Perry Oliver, LLC, Petra O'Brien, LLC, Peyton Burke, LLC, Phillip Odom, LLC, Preston O'Neil, LLC, TOB Rentals 10, LLC, TOB Rentals 8, LLC, TOB Rentals 9, LLC, TOB8 Rentals 2, LLC, TOB8 Rentals, LLC, TOB9 Rentals, LLC, Tammie Oxley, LLC, Tara Sullivan, LLC, Tate Otto, LLC, Taylor Singleton, LLC, Teddy Shelton, LLC, Tegan Olsen, LLC, Teresa Oak, LLC, Tesla Overcash, LLC, Thad Schmitt, LLC, Theo Otterman, LLC, Thomas Ostrom, LLC, Tiffany Overstreet, LLC, Timothy O'Keefe, LLC, Tobias Simpson, LLC, Tony Steele, LLC, Tracey Sutton, LLC, Travis Schaffer, LLC, Trenton Oxford, LLC, Trey Stevenson, LLC, Tristan Oakland, LLC, Troy Saunders, LLC, Ty Shae, LLC, Tyler Sawyer, LLC, Daniel West. (Casola, Francis)
December 2, 2022 Filing 70 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Luxe Properties, LLC, Jennifer M. West. (Faglioni, Kelly)
December 2, 2022 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Nathaniel Stuart Shepherd on behalf of Luxe Properties, LLC, Jennifer M. West (Shepherd, Nathaniel)
December 2, 2022 Filing 68 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jennifer M. West (Faglioni, Kelly)
December 2, 2022 Filing 67 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Luxe Properties, LLC (Faglioni, Kelly)
December 2, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Kelly Lynn Faglioni on behalf of Luxe Properties, LLC, Jennifer M. West (Faglioni, Kelly)
November 18, 2022 Filing 65 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Alison Carroll, LLC, Castle Farms, LLC, DJ-CP, LLC, DJ-MT, LLC, DJRC, LLC, HHL Rentals 2, LLC, HHL Rentals 3, LLC, HHL Rentals 4, LLC, HHL Rentals 5, LLC, HHL Rentals 6, LLC, HHL Rentals 7, LLC, HHL Rentals, LLC, KL Rentals 2, LLC, KL Rentals, LLC, Lubna2055, LLC, OTB Rentals 7, LLC, OTB Rentals 7-2, LLC, OTB7 Rentals 2, LLC, OTB7 Rentals, LLC, Oak Tree Professional Park, LLC, Paige Oats, LLC, Patrick Oakley, LLC, Paul Overton, LLC, Pauline Owens, LLC, Penny Osborne, LLC, Percy Bedford, LLC, Perry Oliver, LLC, Petra O'Brien, LLC, Peyton Burke, LLC, Phillip Odom, LLC, Preston O'Neil, LLC, TOB Rentals 10, LLC, TOB Rentals 8, LLC, TOB Rentals 9, LLC, TOB8 Rentals 2, LLC, TOB8 Rentals, LLC, TOB9 Rentals, LLC, Tammie Oxley, LLC, Tara Sullivan, LLC, Tate Otto, LLC, Taylor Singleton, LLC, Teddy Shelton, LLC, Tegan Olsen, LLC, Teresa Oak, LLC, Tesla Overcash, LLC, Thad Schmitt, LLC, Theo Otterman, LLC, Thomas Ostrom, LLC, Tiffany Overstreet, LLC, Timothy O'Keefe, LLC, Tobias Simpson, LLC, Tony Steele, LLC, Tracey Sutton, LLC, Travis Schaffer, LLC, Trenton Oxford, LLC, Trey Stevenson, LLC, Tristan Oakland, LLC, Troy Saunders, LLC, Ty Shae, LLC, Tyler Sawyer, LLC, Daniel West. (Attachments: # Exhibit A-D replaced; Replaced deficient/incorrect pdf document with corrected pdf document
November 18, 2022 Filing 64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Alison Carroll, LLC, Castle Farms, LLC, DJ-CP, LLC, DJ-MT, LLC, DJRC, LLC, HHL Rentals 2, LLC, HHL Rentals 3, LLC, HHL Rentals 4, LLC, HHL Rentals 5, LLC, HHL Rentals 6, LLC, HHL Rentals 7, LLC, HHL Rentals, LLC, KL Rentals 2, LLC, KL Rentals, LLC, Lubna2055, LLC, OTB Rentals 7, LLC, OTB Rentals 7-2, LLC, OTB7 Rentals 2, LLC, OTB7 Rentals, LLC, Oak Tree Professional Park, LLC, Paige Oats, LLC, Patrick Oakley, LLC, Paul Overton, LLC, Pauline Owens, LLC, Penny Osborne, LLC, Percy Bedford, LLC, Perry Oliver, LLC, Petra O'Brien, LLC, Peyton Burke, LLC, Phillip Odom, LLC, Preston O'Neil, LLC, TOB Rentals 10, LLC, TOB Rentals 8, LLC, TOB Rentals 9, LLC, TOB8 Rentals 2, LLC, TOB8 Rentals, LLC, TOB9 Rentals, LLC, Tammie Oxley, LLC, Tara Sullivan, LLC, Tate Otto, LLC, Taylor Singleton, LLC, Teddy Shelton, LLC, Tegan Olsen, LLC, Teresa Oak, LLC, Tesla Overcash, LLC, Thad Schmitt, LLC, Theo Otterman, LLC, Thomas Ostrom, LLC, Tiffany Overstreet, LLC, Timothy O'Keefe, LLC, Tobias Simpson, LLC, Tony Steele, LLC, Tracey Sutton, LLC, Travis Schaffer, LLC, Trenton Oxford, LLC, Trey Stevenson, LLC, Tristan Oakland, LLC, Troy Saunders, LLC, Ty Shae, LLC, Tyler Sawyer, LLC, Daniel West. (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 63 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tracey Sutton, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 62 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tyler Sawyer, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 61 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ty Shae, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 60 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Troy Saunders, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 59 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tristan Oakland, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 58 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trey Stevenson, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 57 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trenton Oxford, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 56 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travis Schaffer, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 55 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tony Steele, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 54 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tobias Simpson, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 53 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOB9 Rentals, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 52 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOB8 Rentals, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 51 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOB8 Rentals 2, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 50 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOB Rentals 10, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 49 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOB Rentals 9, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 48 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOB Rentals 8, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 47 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Timothy O'Keefe, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 46 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tiffany Overstreet, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 45 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thomas Ostrom, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 44 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Theo Otterman, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 43 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thad Schmitt, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 42 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tesla Overcash, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 41 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teresa Oak, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 18, 2022 Filing 40 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tegan Olsen, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 39 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teddy Shelton, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 38 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taylor Singleton, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 37 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tate Otto, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 36 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tara Sullivan, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 35 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tammie Oxley, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 34 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Preston O'Neil, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 33 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phillip Odom, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 32 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peyton Burke, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 31 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Petra O'Brien, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 30 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Perry Oliver, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 29 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Percy Bedford, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 28 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penny Osborne, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 27 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pauline Owens, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 26 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paul Overton, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 25 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Patrick Oakley, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 24 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paige Oats, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 23 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by OTB7 Rentals, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 22 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by OTB7 Rentals 2, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 21 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by OTB Rentals 7-2, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 20 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by OTB Rentals 7, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 19 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oak Tree Professional Park, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 18 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by KL Rentals 2, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 17 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by KL Rentals, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 16 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by HHL Rentals, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 15 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by HHL Rentals 6, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 14 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by HHL Rentals 5, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 13 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by HHL Rentals 4, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 12 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by HHL Rentals 3, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 11 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by HHL Rentals 2, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 10 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by HHL Rentals 7, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 9 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by DJRC, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 8 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by DJ-MT, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 7 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by DJ-CP, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alison Carroll, LLC (Houchens, Aaron)
November 17, 2022 Filing 5 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daniel West (Houchens, Aaron)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Montgomery County Circuit Court. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 11/14/2022. (sln)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (sln)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Requirement - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (sln)
November 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montomgery County Circuit Court, case number CL22001305-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $402, receipt number AVAWDC-4071916), filed by Tony Steele, LLC, Lubna2055, LLC, Teresa Oak, LLC, HHL Rentals 6, LLC, Tyler Sawyer, LLC, Trey Stevenson, LLC, Patrick Oakley, LLC, Daniel West, HHL Rentals 7, LLC, DJRC, LLC, TOB Rentals 8, LLC, Oak Tree Professional Park, LLC, Tara Sullivan, LLC, TOB9 Rentals, LLC, Pauline Owens, LLC, Castle Farms, LLC, Teddy Shelton, LLC, TOB8 Rentals, LLC, KL Rentals, LLC, OTB7 Rentals, LLC, Troy Saunders, LLC, Travis Schaffer, LLC, TOB Rentals 9, LLC, Tate Otto, LLC, Preston O'Neil, LLC, TOB8 Rentals 2, LLC, OTB7 Rentals 2, LLC, Thomas Ostrom, LLC, Petra O'Brien, LLC, Paige Oats, LLC, Taylor Singleton, LLC, HHL Rentals 4, LLC, Timothy O'Keefe, LLC, TOB Rentals 10, LLC, KL Rentals 2, LLC, HHL Rentals 3, LLC, Perry Oliver, LLC, Tobias Simpson, LLC, Phillip Odom, LLC, Tristan Oakland, LLC, Tammie Oxley, LLC, OTB Rentals 7-2, LLC, Theo Otterman, LLC, Thad Schmitt, LLC, DJ-MT, LLC, Penny Osborne, LLC, Paul Overton, LLC, Ty Shae, LLC, Percy Bedford, LLC, Tegan Olsen, LLC, Tracey Sutton, LLC, HHL Rentals 5, LLC, DJ-CP, LLC, Peyton Burke, LLC, Alison Carroll, LLC, Tesla Overcash, LLC, OTB Rentals 7, LLC, Tiffany Overstreet, LLC, HHL Rentals, LLC, Trenton Oxford, LLC, HHL Rentals 2, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Severance Order, #3 Exhibit C: Second Severance Order & Opinion, #4 Exhibit D: Operating Agreement DJ-CP, LLC, #5 Exhibit E: Operating Agreement DJRC, LLC, #6 Exhibit F: Operating Agreement DJ-MT, LLC, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln) Modified on 11/14/2022 (sln).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luxe Properties, LLC et al v. West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJRC, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Schaffer, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel West
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJ-CP, LLC
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJ-RC, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJ-MT, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Farms, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lubna2055, LLC
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Carroll, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HHL Rentals 2, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HHL Rentals 3, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HHL Rentals 4, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HHL Rentals 5, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HHL Rentals 6, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HHL Rentals 7, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HHL Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KL Rentals 2, LLC
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KL Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak Tree Professional Park, LLC
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTB Rentals 7-2, LLC
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTB Rentals 7, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTB7 Rentals 2, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTB7 Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige Oats, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Oakley, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Overton, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline Owens, LLC
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Osborne, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Percy Bedford, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Oliver, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petra O'Brien, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peyton Burke, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Odom, LLC
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston O'Neil, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabitha Sexton, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammie Oxley, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Sullivan, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Otto, LLC
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Singleton, LLC
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teddy Shelton, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tegan Olsen, LLC
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Oak, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Overcash, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thad Schmitt, LLC
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theo Otterman, LLC
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ostrom, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Overstreet, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy O'Keefe, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOB Rentals 10, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOB Rentals 8, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOB Rentals 9, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOB8 Rentals 2, LLC
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOB8 Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOB9 Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobias Simpson, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Steele, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Sutton, LLC
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trenton Oxford, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trey Stevenson, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristan Oakland, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Saunders, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Shae, LLC
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Sawyer, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Hill Wood
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luxe Properties, LLC
Represented By: Kelly Lynn Faglioni
Represented By: Nathaniel Stuart Shepherd
Represented By: Sarah Constance Ingles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer M. West
Represented By: Kelly Lynn Faglioni
Represented By: Nathaniel Stuart Shepherd
Represented By: Sarah Constance Ingles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Dickenson, LLC
Represented By: Kelly Lynn Faglioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?