Meridian Waste Virginia, LLC v. Pulaski Service Authority et al
Plaintiff: Meridian Waste Virginia, LLC doing business as Meridian Waste Solutions doing business as Meridian Waste-Blue Ridge Hauling & MRF
Defendant: Pulaski Service Authority and Pulaski County Board of Supervisors
Case Number: 7:2023cv00327
Filed: June 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2023 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Meridian Waste Virginia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Petersen, John)
July 27, 2023 Filing 9 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Pulaski County Board of Supervisors, Pulaski Service Authority. (Wright, Kristin)
July 27, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Pulaski County Board of Supervisors, Pulaski Service Authority. (Wright, Kristin)
July 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Button Wright on behalf of Pulaski County Board of Supervisors, Pulaski Service Authority (Wright, Kristin)
July 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Dillow Royer on behalf of Pulaski County Board of Supervisors, Pulaski Service Authority (Royer, Jennifer)
June 27, 2023 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Pulaski Service Authority NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(sln)
June 26, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Pulaski Service Authority by Meridian Waste Virginia, LLC (Petersen, John)
June 21, 2023 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Pulaski County Board of Supervisors NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(sln)
June 16, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Pulaski County Board of Supervisors by Meridian Waste Virginia, LLC (Petersen, John) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/21/2023) (sln). (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/21/2023; Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document) (sln).
June 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLATORY RELIEF against Pulaski County Board of Supervisors, Pulaski Service Authority (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-4198355.), filed by Meridian Waste Virginia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meridian Waste Virginia, LLC v. Pulaski Service Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meridian Waste Virginia, LLC doing business as Meridian Waste Solutions doing business as Meridian Waste-Blue Ridge Hauling & MRF
Represented By: John Chapman Petersen
Represented By: Terry Gene Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski Service Authority
Represented By: Kristin Button Wright
Represented By: Jennifer Dillow Royer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Jennifer Dillow Royer
Represented By: Kristin Button Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?