Moore v. Squire et al
Plaintiff: Keyanta Lamont Moore
Defendant: Sgt. C. Squire, Sgt. N. Bowman, R. Boyd, H. Hess, Owens, Warden, Investigator M. Fleming, Ms. Raskie, Sgt. Fleming, Lt. Dye, Lt. Harrison, Sgt. Steel, Ms. Harr, Ms. Rasnake and Sgt. Stell
Case Number: 7:2023cv00439
Filed: July 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint - add Violations of 8th and 14th Amendment to this civil suit by Keyanta Lamont Moore. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (slt)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Letter/Request for Confirmation of Consent to Fee Form being received by Keyanta Lamont Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) by Keyanta Lamont Moore. ( Clerk sending docket sheet. ) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slt)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/6/2023. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(aab)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct - Add Claim No. 22 to Claim No. 7 #1 Complaint by Keyanta Lamont Moore. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (aab) . (Clerk sending docket sheet)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Keyanta Lamont Moore. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (aab)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Keyanta Lamont Moore: Red Onion State Prison P.O. Box 970 Pound, Virginia 24279 (aab)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter/Request regarding mail being tampered. Providing the court with a copy of everything previously sent by Keyanta Lamont Moore. ( Clerk sending docket sheet. Requestor will receive a copy of any order when the Court issues it. ) (Attachments: #1 Copy of pleadings previously sent)(aab)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Response regarding defendant Boyd being two different defendants re #9 Memorandum Opinion and Order filed by Keyanta Lamont Moore. (aab)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Add Claim 22) #1 Complaint by Keyanta Lamont Moore. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Clerk sending docket sheet) (aab)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying in part and granting in part #8 motion to amend. It is DENIED as moot as to Claim 20 and DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Claim 21. It is GRANTED as to the spelling of defendants' names, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to update the spelling of the defendant previously identified as Raskie to Rasnake, and the defendant previously identified as Sgt. Steel to Sgt. Stell. It is further ORDERED that this case is SEVERED into a total of eight cases (this case and seven new cases). The Clerk is DIRECTED to open seven new cases and to conditionally file a copy of Moore's complaint (Dkt. Nos. #1 and #6 ) in each new case, with each case involving the topics as listed below. This case shall involve the allegations in paragraphs 1-6, 8-12, and 20. The defendants remaining in this action will be Squire, Bowman, Boyd, Hess, Owens, Dye, Stell, and Harr. The Clerk shall TERMINATE all other defendants from this case. By separate order, the court will direct that the Clerk notify these eight defendants of this lawsuit, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 and the Agreement on Acceptance of Service. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/9/2023. (Opinion and Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(aab)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Add Claims) #1 Complaint by Keyanta Lamont Moore. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Clerk sending docket sheet) (aab)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Keyanta Lamont Moore (aab)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Additional Evidence - Claim re #1 Complaint by Keyanta Lamont Moore (tvt)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 7/18/2023. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 7/18/2023. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Account Report and Statement of Assets by Keyanta Lamont Moore (tvt)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Keyanta Lamont Moore. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (tvt)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against N. Bowman, R. Boyd, Lt. Dye, M. Fleming, Sgt. Fleming, Ms. Harr, Lt. Harrison, H. Hess, Owens, Ms. Raskie, C. Squire, Sgt. Steel, Warden, filed by Keyanta Lamont Moore.(tvt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Squire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyanta Lamont Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. C. Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. N. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigator M. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Raskie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Steel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Harr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Rasnake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Stell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?