Gragg v. Keller et al
Plaintiff: Hunter Tracey Gragg
Defendant: Major Keller, Trinity Food Services and WVRJA
Case Number: 7:2024cv00098
Filed: February 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Major Keller, Trinity Food Services and WVRJA on 3/22/2024. (Service paperwork mailed to Defendant(s) at following address Western Virginia Regional Jail, 5885 West River Road, Salem, VA 24153.) Waiver of Service due by 4/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Trinity Food Services, #2 WVRJA)(tvt)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order entered Directing the Clerk to attempt service of process upon the named defendants Keller, Trinity Food Services, WVRJA re #1 Complaint filed by Hunter Tracey Gragg, Granting In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 3/22/2024. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party/Parties via US Mail)(tvt)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Hunter Tracey Gragg (aab)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hunter Tracey Gragg. (aab)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/20/2024. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party/Parties via US Mail)(aab)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Account Report and Statement of Assets by Hunter Tracey Gragg (aab)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account; Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/7/2024. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(aab) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/8/2024) (aab). Modified on 2/8/2024, corrected case number. NEF and Corrected order mailed to plaintiff (aab).
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Keller, Trinity Food Services, filed by Hunter Tracey Gragg.(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gragg v. Keller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Tracey Gragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Food Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WVRJA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?