Lotusflower v. Washington Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Nonnie Lotusflower and Nathan R Goninan
Defendant: Holbrook, Sundberg, Ivy, Alden, Airway Heights Chaplain, Bowman, Washington Department of Corrections, Scott Russell and Steven Sinclair
Case Number: 4:2019cv05025
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Nonnie Lotusflower. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed First Amended Complaint)(CLP, Case Administrator) **8 PAGES, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Nonnie Lotusflower, Prisoner ID: #869663)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nonnie Lotusflower (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Nonnie Lotusflower, Prisoner ID: #869663)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk's Office to Nonnie Lotusflower dated February 22, 2019, regarding copy request. (PL, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE, PRINT ALL** (Nonnie Lotusflower, Prisoner ID: #869663)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. < (PL, Case Administrator) **PRINT ALL** (Nonnie Lotusflower, Prisoner ID: #869663)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address. Notification received by prison. New address: Monroe Correctional Complex, PO Box 777, Monroe, WA 98272-0777. (PL, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Nonnie Lotusflower, Prisoner ID: #869663)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Note to Court from Nonnie Lotusflower received on 2/21/19. (PL, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Nonnie Lotusflower, Prisoner ID: #869663)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH E-FILING PROGRAM. The Eastern District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 16-35-1, participation in the E-Filing Program is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at facilities participating in the Prison E-Filing Program. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the law librarian/designee for electronic filing. (PL, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Nonnie Lotusflower, Prisoner ID: #869663)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # IFP) IFP Pending. Jury Demand. Filed by Nonnie Lotusflower. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(PL, Case Administrator) **8 PAGES, PRINT NEF ONLY**(Nonnie Lotusflower, Prisoner ID: #869663)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lotusflower v. Washington Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nonnie Lotusflower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan R Goninan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airway Heights Chaplain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?