Browne et al v. Avvo Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs sued defendant Avvo Inc. and alleged that thousands of lawyers have suffered damage to their professional reputations by Avvo\'s publication of capricious and arbitrary ratings to consumers via the Internet.

Additional Resources

Plaintiff: John Henry Browne and Alan J Wenokur
Defendant: Avvo Inc, Mark Britton and John 1-25 Does
Case Number: 2:2007cv00920
Filed: June 14, 2007
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2007 19
JUDGMENT BY COURT granting defendants' motion to dismiss (RS, )
October 5, 2007 17
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 3-10 days. Bench Trial is set for 1/5/2009 at 09:00 AM before Hon Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 11/4/2007, Motion for Class Certification due by 3/13/2008 and noted on the Court's calendar for the fifth Friday thereafter, Amended Pleadings due by 7/11/2008, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/11/2008, Discovery completed by 9/9/2008, Dispositive motions due by 10/9/2008, Settlement conference to be held by 11/8/2008, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 12/8/2008, Motions in Limine due by 12/10/2008, Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2008, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/3/2009 (KERR, )
September 21, 2007 16
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties; estimated Trial Days: 3-10.. (Berman, Steve)
July 23, 2007 11 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE-NOTING 6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) ; Noting Date 8/10/2007by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS, )
July 12, 2007 10
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Schedule for Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) Motion by parties. (Breckenridge, Jeniphr)
July 10, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court
AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Following ddls are extended: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/7/2007, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/14/2007, Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2007. (CL, )
July 3, 2007 8 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENTJoint Status Report due by 8/14/2007 by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR, )
June 26, 2007 3
DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Mark Britton on 6/19/2007 (RS, )
June 21, 2007 2
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Avvo Inc on 6/18/2007 (TS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browne et al v. Avvo Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Henry Browne
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan J Wenokur
Represented By: Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avvo Inc
Represented By: Stephen M. Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Britton
Represented By: Stephen M. Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-25 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?