Danielson v. Brennan et al
Plaintiff: Veronica Danielson
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan and U.S. Postal Service
Case Number: 2:2016cv00476
Filed: April 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting Defendants' 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. All of Plaintiff's remaining claims are dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 39 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date and Pre-Trial Deadlines. The trial date is extended from November 27, 2017 to March 26, 2018. All other dates remain unchanged. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Stipulated Motion to extend deadlines; 39.1 mediation to be completed by 8/23/2017, Dispositive motions due by 9/22/2017, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danielson v. Brennan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Danielson
Represented By: Christopher J Stockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?