Gohranson et al v. Snohomish County et al
Plaintiff: John T. Gohranson
Defendant: Snohomish County, Robert Trenary, Stuart Andrews M.D., Dan Miller, Elaine Gravatt, Gregory Hardy, Sherrise Holland, Lauren Kooiman, Jean Leight, Betty Lusk, Joy Maine, Linet Ngete, Andrew Fletcher, Rachelle Rose, Shane Stevie, Robin Otto, Roxanne Marler, John and Jane Does, Maxim Healthcare Services Inc and Cascade Healthcare Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01124
Filed: July 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER permitting amendment of consolidated complaint per parties' 157 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Snohomish County defendants' 82 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying Snohomish County Defendants' 74 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff John Gohranson's Wrongful Death and Survival Claims, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting in part, denying in part and otherwise taking under advisement Snohomish County defendants' 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Federal Claims and Partial Summary Judgment on State Medical Claims; RENOTING motion to 6/29/2018; Defendants' supplemental memorandum due 6/7/2018; Plaintiffs' memorandum due 6/25/2018; Reply, if any, due on or before the note date. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Maxim Healthcare Services Inc, Sherrise Holland and Gregory Hardy. All claims against Defendants Maxim Healthcare Services Inc, Sherrise Holland and Gregory Hardy are dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Cascade Healthcare Services LLC, Linet Ngete, and Elaine Gravatt re parties' 130 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Cascade Healthcare Services LLC, Linet Ngete, Cascade Healthcare Services LLC and Elaine Gravatt terminated.)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting Snohomish County defendants' 70 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Disclosure of DSHS Records re parties' 68 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadlines re parties' 66 Stipulated Motion : Discovery completed by 12/5/2017, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/20/2017, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/17/2017; all other deadlines shall remain the same, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the deadline for disclosure of expert reports re parties' 58 Stipulation ; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/6/2017, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/6/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER to Consolidate granting Plaintiff's 53 Motion to Consolidate Cases. It is hereby ordered that cause number C17-45RSL be closed and all documents filed in the future regarding these matters shall be filed under cause number C16-1124RSL. Plaintiffs shall, within fourteen days of the date of this Order, file a Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gohranson et al v. Snohomish County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Gohranson
Represented By: Kenneth E. Brewe
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Represented By: Karen D Moore
Represented By: Todd C Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County
Represented By: Katherine H Bosch
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Trenary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Andrews M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Gravatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherrise Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Kooiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Leight
Represented By: Katherine H Bosch
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Lusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linet Ngete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachelle Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Stevie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Marler
Represented By: Katherine H Bosch
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Healthcare Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Healthcare Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?