Martinez Banos v. Asher et al
Petitioner: Arturo Martinez Banos
Respondent: Nathalie Asher, Sarah R Saldana, Jeh Johnson, Juan P. Osuna, Loretta E. Lynch and Lowell Clark
Case Number: 2:2016cv01454
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting Parties' 107 Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings. Proceedings in this case are stayed until September 5, 2020. Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER re 105 Mandate of USCA, 104 Memorandum/Opinion from USCA. The court ORDERS the parties to file, within 14 days of the filing date of this order, a joint status report proposing how the court should proceed on remand. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER deferring consideration of Defendants' 95 Rule 60 Motion for Relief from Court's Final order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Elizabeth Godfrey, Kevin McAleenan and William Barr added. Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Nathalie R Asher and John F Kelly terminated.)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing Items Disclosed by Respondents to Comply with the Court's Final Order Granting Injunctive Relief re parties' 90 Stipulated MOTION, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 86 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Respondents to Hold Bond Hearings and File Status Report. The new deadlines shall be May 7, 2018, for Respondents to conduct bond hearings for currently-eligible class members and May 11, 2018, for Respondents to file the directed report and list with the Court in accordance with the 77 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 77 in its entirety. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Petitioners' 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment . The Court hereby extends Defendants-Respondents' deadline to cross-move for summary judgment and oppose Plaintiffs-Petitioners' motion for summary judg ment to Monday, January 8, 2018. The motions are re-noted for consideration for Friday, January 12, 2018, and any opposition to Defendants-Respondents' cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on that date. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER authorized by Judge James L. Robart. On December 11, 2017, the court issued an order adopting the report and recommendation of the Honorable Brian A. Tsuchida. (Order (Dkt. # 70 ).) Any dispositive motions shall be filed within 30 days of the date of the entry of that order. This matter is RE-REFERRED to Judge Tsuchida for further proceedings. (PM)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 67 in its entirety. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying in part with prejudice and in part without prejudice Plaintiffs' 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING; plaintiffs' brief due 9/25/17; govt's response due 10/4/17; plaintiffs' reply due 10/6/17; directing clerk to renote 57 Amended MOTION to Dismiss All of Remaining Petitioners-Plaintiffs' Individual Claims, 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 41 Amended MOTION to Certify Class ; Noting Date 10/6/2017, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (RS)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting Defendants-Respondents' unopposed 58 motion to seal and directing the Clerk to maintain the seal on Docket Nos. 57 -1 and 57 -2. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (PM)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Defendants' motion to dismiss due 8/4/2017 with a noting date of 9/1/2017. Clerk directed to RE-NOTE plaintiffs' 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and 41 Amended MOTION for class certification: Noting Date 9/1/2017. (PM)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER directing parties to file Joint Status Report by 8/3/2017, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (PM)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 49 Report and Recommendations, 50 Objections to Report and Recommendation ; granting Defendants' 16 First Motion to Dismiss ; dismissing Mr. Martinez's claim s without prejudice and without leave to amend ; striking Defendants' 44 Second Motion to Dismiss without prejudice to renewing ; REFERRING case back to Magistrate Judge Tsuchida for further processings ; directing Clerk to update docket, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida granting Petitioner's 28 Motion for leave to file an amended complaint; amended complaint due 2/1/2017; striking the 2/1/2017 oral argument 25 ; directing parties to file a Joint Status Report by 2/15/2017. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez Banos v. Asher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arturo Martinez Banos
Represented By: Matt Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nathalie Asher
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sarah R Saldana
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeh Johnson
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Juan P. Osuna
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Loretta E. Lynch
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lowell Clark
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?