Hodjera et al v. BASF Catalysts, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Hodjera and Sylvia Hodjera
Defendant: BASF Catalysts, LLC, BorgWarner Morse Tec, Inc, Central Precision Limited, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Canada Corp., DAP Products, Inc., Felt Products Mfg. Co., Honeywell International Inc., Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals LLC, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Volkswagen Group of Canada, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc, Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. and Does 1-350 Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2017cv00048
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation re parties' 224 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Union Carbide Corporation terminated.)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting plaintiffs' 222 Motion to Dismiss Does 1-350, Inclusive without Prejudice, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Does 1-350 Inclusive terminated.)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting plaintiffs' motions for reconsideration, dkt. ## 200 , 201 , 202 ; the Court hereby clarifies that their claims should have been dismissed without prejudice, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING; re-noting Plaintiffs' 201 Motion to Modify Order Dismissing Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. "With Prejudice" Based on a Jurisdictional Defec ; Noting Date 9/1/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Court grants Plaintiffs' request and directs the Clerk of Court to renote Plaintiffs' 202 Motion to Modify Order Dismissing Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc., With Prejudice Based on a Jurisdictional Defect; Noting Date is 9/1/2017. (PM)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Pnuemo Abex, LLC re parties' 203 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Pneumo Abex LLC terminated.)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC, LLC re parties' 191 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)(BorgWarner Morse Tec, Inc terminated.)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER denying as moot plaintiffs' 117 Motion for Priority Trial Setting, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc. re parties' 178 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)(Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc. terminated.)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting Defendant Dana Canada Corp.'s 98 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs' claims against Dana Canada are dismissed without prejudice, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (Dana Canada Corp. terminated.) (SWT)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying as moot Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s 128 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Second and Third Requests for Production of Documents, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting Defendant Volkswagen Group of Canada's 75 Motion to Dismiss ; denying as moot Defendant Volkswagen Group of Canada's 101 Motion for Protective Order ; denying as moot Defendant Volkswagen Group of Canada's 123 M otion to Quash ; denying as moot Defendant Volkswagen Group of Canada's 130 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents; Plaintiffs' claims against VWGC are dismissed without prejudice, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (Volkswagen Group of Canada terminated.) (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodjera et al v. BASF Catalysts, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hodjera
Represented By: Alexandra B Caggiano
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Couture
Represented By: Charles Stein Siegel(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Brian Weinstein
Represented By: Patrick J Wigle(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Hodjera
Represented By: Alexandra B Caggiano
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Couture
Represented By: Charles Stein Siegel(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Brian Weinstein
Represented By: Patrick J Wigle(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Catalysts, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Morse Tec, Inc
Represented By: Richard D Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Precision Limited
Represented By: Terry Paul Anastassiou(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Stephan Choo(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: N. Kathleen Strickland(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC
Represented By: Diane J. Kero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Canada Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felt Products Mfg. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Mary P Gaston
Represented By: Kristine E Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Gannon Crisera
Represented By: William James Leedom
Represented By: Benjamin Walther(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Gannon Crisera
Represented By: William James Leedom
Represented By: Benjamin Walther(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Diane J. Kero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Minerals LLC
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Rebecca A Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-350 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?