Carnahan v. Alpha Epsilon Pi Fraternity Inc et al
Plaintiff: Evan L Carnahan
Defendant: Alpha Epsilon PI Fraternity Inc and David Leon
Case Number: 2:2017cv00086
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting Parties' 152 Stipulated Motion for Brief Extension of Deadline for Defense Expert Discovery: Defendant shall disclose his rebuttal expert reports no later than February 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (MW)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE; SETTING DEADLINES 147 Telephone Conference. Bench Trial is set for 6/28/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stanley A. Bastian in Seattle. Parties shall file jury trial waivers on or before November 20, 2020 . Pretrial Conference (video) set for 6/8/2021 at 11:00 AM. Deadline for remaining discovery from Plaintiff to Defendant is 11/30/2020, Deadline for remaining discovery from Defendant to Plaintiff is 1/15/2021; Dispositive motions due by 2/16/2 021, Motions in Limine due by 5/17/2021, Exhibit and Witness Lists due by 5/24/2021, Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation due 6/1/2021, Designation of Testimony due 5/14/2021. Pretrial Order due by 6/7/2021, Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/3/2021. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (PM)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 AMENDED JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial is set for 1/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Seattle before Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2021 at 01:30 PM, Motions in Limine due by 12/8/2020 and shall be noted for hear ing at the pretrial conference, Exhibit and Witness List due by 12/15/2020, The pretrial exhibit stipulation shall be filed on 12/9/2020, The parties shall notify the Court on or before 12/8/2020 whether deposition testimony will be used at trial, Pretrial Order due by 12/29/2020, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 12/28/2020. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (MW)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting Defendant's 132 Motion to Take the Trial Perpetuation Deposition of David Easlick, or, Alternatively, Motion for Trial Continuance. A telephonic status conference will be held on February 4th, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. to di scuss the timing of discovery regarding this expert issue, and a new trial date. Participants are to call the Court Conference Line at 1-888-204-5984, with the access code of 6790153. The Parties are encouraged to prepare a joint discovery plan to discuss at this status conference. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (TH)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER denying Defendant's 124 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (TH)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER striking Plaintiff's 75 Motion in Limine with leave to renew; striking Defendant's 77 Motion in Limine with leave to renew. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian.(MW)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting in part plaintiff's 95 Motion for Limited Additional Discovery ; denying as moot defendant's 93 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING 77 MOTIONS IN LIMINE and 75 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ; Noting Date 6/7/2019 (KERR)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 63 Motion to Compel Discovery and Determine Sufficiency of Answers, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting plaintiff's 45 SEALED Motion to Determine the Applicability of Work-Product Protection, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Discovery for Deposition of Charlotte Smith, MD re parties' 65 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 59 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with prejudice Defendant Alpha Epsilon PI Fraternity Inc. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting plaintiff's 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Add Parties; the deadline for adding parties is continued until 1/14/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss ; RENOTING defendant's 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Noting Date 7/14/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the complaint should not be dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 5/9/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carnahan v. Alpha Epsilon Pi Fraternity Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan L Carnahan
Represented By: Mark Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Epsilon PI Fraternity Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?