Ramirez Medina v. Asher
Petitioner: Daniel Ramirez Medina
Respondent: Nathalie Asher, John Kelly, US Department of Homeland Security and Lowell Clark
Amicus: United We Dream
Case Number: 2:2017cv00218
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 147 Motion for Second Preliminary Injunction, Or, in the Alternative, to Compel Compliance with Preliminary Injunction Order; granting Defendants' 152 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint and Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing without prejudice all of Mr. Ramirez's claims asserted in his Third Amended Complaint (Dkt. # 144 ) Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline to August 7, 2019 for Defendants to respond to the Third Amended Complaint per parties' 150 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 145 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Response deadline continued to July 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 140 Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint: Plaintiff shall file and serve his Third Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(MW)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 134 Motion to Complete the Administrative Record; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 134 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 AMENDED ORDER granting Plaintiff's 122 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez on 5/15/2018. (Amended to correct typo in case caption of Order filed at Dkt. 132 ) (SWT)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 122 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall not terminate Plaintiff's DACA status and work authorization pending a final decision by this Court on the merits of his claims. Defendant USCIS is EN JOINED from asserting, adopting, or relying in any proceedings on any statement or record made as of this date purporting to allege or establish that Mr. Ramirez is a gang member, gang affiliated, or a threat to public safety. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Extending Deadline for Federal Agency Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint re parties' 117 Stipulation. Defendants' deadline to answer Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is extended fourteen days, to December 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying Defendants' 90 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting plaintiff's 106 Ex Parte Motion to extend time to serve the Doe Defendants signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 104 Stipulated Motion to extend and consolidate time to respond and to modify briefing schedule for individual defendants' response to the second amended complaint signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying parties' 100 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 95 Stipulated Motion extending deadline for dft Lance Hernandez to 8/10/17 to respond to second amended complaint signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 88 Stipulated Motion to modify briefing schedule re the Federal Agency Defendants' response to the second amended complaint signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting Ex Parte Petitioner's 73 Motion to continue deadline; Deadline to respond to respondents' objections to the R&R is continued to 4/25/17 by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez ADOPTING IN PART Judge Donohue's Report and Recommendations re 66 conditional release. Petitioner's Objections are DENIED. (SSM)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS AND DECLINING ORAL ARGUMENT: RE-NOTING petitioner's 66 OBJECTIONS to 64 Report and Recommendations; Noting Date 3/16/2017; respondents to file response to objections by 3/21/17; no reply shall be filed by petitioner; any objections re respondents' motion to dismiss remain due no later than 3/28/17 by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER by Hon. James P. Donohue, United States Magistrate Judge, regarding Petitioner's response to Government's 52 MOTION to Dismiss. (TF)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 49 REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE HEARING ON CONDITIONAL RELEASE by Hon. James P. Donohue. (TF)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Hon. James P. Donohue. Petitioner's motion for immediate release from the ongoing removal proceedings is DENIED. Expedited bond hearing before an Immigration Judge to be requested no later than 2/21/2017 at noo n. If requested, respondents shall arrange for Mr. Ramirez to have a bond hearing before an Immigration Judge by Friday, 2/24/2017. Amended habeas petition due by 2/21/2017 at noon. Government's motion to dismiss on jurisdictional grounds is d ue by Friday, 2/24/2017 at 5:00 p.m; Response due 3/3/2017 by 5:00 p.m.; Reply due 3/7/2017 at noon. Oral argument on the Government's motion to dismiss to be held on 3/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12A. The unopposed motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief by United We Dream, Dkt. 38 , is GRANTED. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez Medina v. Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Ramirez Medina
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: John Barrera(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn A. Eidmann(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jesse S. Gabriel(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jose Garcia(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth Hadaway(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Hawkins
Represented By: Anne M. Hudson-Price(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Leah M. Litman(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Judy London(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katherine Marquart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Luis Cortes Romero(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark D. Rosenbaum(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Laurence H. Tribe(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nathalie Asher
Represented By: Aaron S Goldsmith
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Kelly
Represented By: Aaron S Goldsmith
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Aaron S Goldsmith
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lowell Clark
Represented By: Aaron S Goldsmith
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: United We Dream
Represented By: Ambika K Doran
Represented By: Stephen M. Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?