Bodyguard Productions, Inc. v. Doe 1 et al
Plaintiff: |
Bodyguard Productions Inc |
Defendant: |
Doe 1, Doe 2, Doe 3, Doe 4, Doe 5, Doe 6, Doe 7, Doe 8, Doe 9, Doe 10, Doe 11, Doe 12 and Doe 13 |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01648 |
Filed: |
November 3, 2017 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington |
Office: |
Seattle Office |
County: |
King |
Presiding Judge: |
Ricardo S Martinez |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyrights |
Cause of Action: |
17 U.S.C. ยง 101 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 6, 2018 |
Filing
43
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Default Judgment against Julie Baker. Defendant Julie Baker is individually liable for statutory damages in the amount of $750.00, attorneys' fees in the amount of $808.00, and costs in the amount of $525.00. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Defendant Julie Baker via first class mail
|
June 1, 2018 |
Filing
33
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Proceed with Case. Plaintiff is hereby authorized to disclose the subscriber information provided by the ISP (as is required to file and serve the amended complaint) and thereafter communicate with the defendant as permitted under the rules. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH) (cc: Julie Baker via first class mail)
|
May 25, 2018 |
Filing
31
ORDER denying Defendant Julie Baker's 28 Motion to Quash Subpoena, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Julie Baker via USPS)
|
April 24, 2018 |
Filing
30
MINUTE ORDER directing Clerk to note Defendant Julie Baker's 28 MOTION to Quash for 5/4/2018; Ms. Baker's reply in support of the Motion to Quash is due 5/4/2018. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: Defendant Baker via first class mail
|
March 26, 2018 |
Filing
27
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 18 Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Discovery; granting Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Extend Time to Serve the Complaint; granting Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Extension of Initial Scheduling Dates. The pending initial scheduling dates (Dkt. # 9 ) are hereby vacated and the Court will set new initial scheduling dates upon the filing of an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
|
February 2, 2018 |
Filing
20
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff to show cause within 14 days of this order. Plaintiff's 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve the Complaint, 17 MOTION for Extension of Time of Initial Scheduling Dates, and 18 MOTION for Leave for Expedited Discovery are renoted for 2/16/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
|
January 24, 2018 |
Filing
16
ORDER SEVERING DOE DEFENDANTS AND DISMISSING CLAIMS. The Court rejects Bodyguard's swarm joinder theory. Bodyguard's claim against Doe Defendant 1 (IP address 73.140.214.38) is accordingly SEVERED from the claims against Does 2-13, and the claims against Does 2-13 are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing
10
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff, within fourteen days of this Order, to show cause in writing why the Court should not: (1) sever all defendants except the first defendant in this case; and (2) dismiss the remaining defendants without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?