Padilla et al v. US Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al Featured Case

The Northwest Immigrant Rights Project has filed a lawsuit against the Trump administration on behalf of three Central American women being detained in Washington, thousands of miles from where their children are being held. The class-action lawsuit alleges that dozens of immigrants are being separated from their children and detained in Washington state and that the administration is unnecessarily prolonging their separation.

Plaintiff: Yolany Padilla, Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes and Baltazar Vasquez
Defendant: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Department of Homeland Security, US Customs and Border Protection, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Department of Health and Human Services, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Thomas Homan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, L. Francis Cissna, Alex M. Azar, II, Scott Lloyd, Marc J Moore, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Lowell Clark, Charles Ingram and David Shinn
Case Number: 2:2018cv00928
Filed: June 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CLARIFYING SCOPE OF CLASS re parties' 157 Stipulation. The Court hereby CLARIFIES that the Bond Hearing Class includes individuals who otherwise satisfy the requirements for class membership but were determined to have a credible fear of torture, rather than only individuals determined to have a credible fear of persecution. Accordingly, the preliminary injunction in this case (as partially stayed by the Ninth Circuit), applies to these individuals. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
August 28, 2019 Filing 157 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Clarifying Scope of Class by parties (Bingham, Lauren)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE ORDER terminating the Government's 136 Motion to Dismiss while the appeal is pending. Once the appeal is resolved, the Government is directed to re-file its motion to dismiss if it still wishes the Court to rule upon it. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER OF USCA (19-35565) as to 150 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Elizabeth Godfrey, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Matthew T. Albence, US Department of Homeland Security, William P Barr, James Janecka, David Shinn, Charles Ingram, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, US Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K. McAleenan, John P. Sanders. (GT)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER OF USCA (19-35565) staying the district court's orders 110 149 re: Preliminary Injunction, re: 150 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Elizabeth Godfrey, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Matthew T. Albence, US Department of Homeland Security, William P Barr, James Janecka, David Shinn, Charles Ingram, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, US Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K. McAleenan, John P. Sanders. (GT) Modified on 7/12/2019 to link to orders being stayed (PM).
July 9, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 6/28/2019 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Debbie Zurn, debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2019, (DZ)
July 9, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Joseph A. Darrow for Defendants Matthew T. Albence, Alex M. Azar, II, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Elizabeth Godfrey, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, John P. Sanders, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Darrow, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 151 USCA Case Number 19-35565 for 150 Notice of Appeal, filed by Elizabeth Godfrey, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Matthew T. Albence, US Department of Homeland Security, William P Barr, James Janecka, David Shinn, Charles Ingram, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, US Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K. McAleenan, John P. Sanders. (GT)
July 3, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE OF APPEAL (19-35565) to Ninth Circuit re 149 Order on Motion to Vacate,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Matthew T. Albence, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Elizabeth Godfrey, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, John P. Sanders, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Bingham, Lauren) Modified on 7/8/2019 to add CCA# (GT).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER on Motions re: Preliminary Injunction (Dkts. 114 , 131 ). The Court GRANTS the requested relief. The preliminary injunction, as modified, will enter into effect 14 days from the date of this order. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
July 1, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re 141 Response to Motion, 126 Response to Motion, 140 Reply to Response to Motion, by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez (Kang, Leila)
June 28, 2019 Filing 147 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Aaron Korthuis, Leila Kang, Anand Balakrishnan, Matt Adams; Def Counsel: Lauren Bingham, Brianna Evans; CR: Debbie Zurn. Motion Hearing held on 6/28/2019 regarding 131 Cross MOTION for Modification of the Existing Preliminary Injunction & 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Oral argument presented. Court will issue written order. (RM)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER re: parties' 143 Joint Stipulated Motion Regarding Preliminary Injunction Implementation. Based on the foregoing stipulation of the parties, IT IS SO ORDERED. Compliance with the preliminary injunction is STAYED until July 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 145 NOTIFICATION REGARDING PROPOSED VIDEO RECORDING. At least one party or the presiding judge has opposed the request to video record. The hearing regarding 131 Cross MOTION for Modification of the Existing Preliminary Injunction & 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction scheduled on 6/28/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman will not be video recorded. (RM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE of Request for Video Recording regarding hearing on 131 Cross MOTION for Modification of the Existing Preliminary Injunction & 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 6/28/2019 at 9:00 before Marsha J. Pechman. Parties must submit PARTY RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR VIDEO RECORDING before 6/27/2019 at 3:00 PM. Please Note: This form must not be filed electronically with the Court. (RM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 143 Joint Stipulated MOTION Regarding Preliminary Injunction Implementation, filed by Defendants Matthew T. Albence, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Elizabeth Godfrey, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, John P. Sanders, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Noting Date 6/25/2019, (Bingham, Lauren)
June 21, 2019 Filing 142 REPLY, filed by Defendants Matthew T. Albence, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Elizabeth Godfrey, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, John P. Sanders, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, TO RESPONSE to 136 MOTION to Dismiss (Bingham, Lauren)
June 17, 2019 Filing 141 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez, to 136 MOTION to Dismiss . Oral Argument Requested. (Korthuis, Aaron)
June 14, 2019 Filing 140 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez, TO RESPONSE to 131 Cross MOTION for Modification of the Existing Preliminary Injunction re 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction , 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Citation Attachment 1)(Kang, Leila)
June 10, 2019 Filing 139 RESPONSE, by Defendants Matthew T. Albence, Alex M. Azar, II, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Elizabeth Godfrey, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, John P. Sanders, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, to 131 Cross MOTION for Modification of the Existing Preliminary Injunction re 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction , 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction . (Ramkumar, Archith)
June 4, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING TIME. The Hearing time has been changed regarding 131 Cross MOTION for Modification of the Existing Preliminary Injunction & 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction : ORAL ARGUMENT/Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Each side is allowed 30 minutes for argument, including rebuttal.(RM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 137 DECLARATION of Russell Hott filed by Defendants Matthew T. Albence, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Elizabeth Godfrey, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, John P. Sanders, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services re 136 MOTION to Dismiss (Bingham, Lauren)
June 3, 2019 Filing 136 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Matthew T. Albence, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Elizabeth Godfrey, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, John P. Sanders, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/21/2019, (Bingham, Lauren)
May 30, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE of Hearing 131 Cross MOTION for Modification of the Existing Preliminary Injunction & 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction : ORAL ARGUMENT/Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Each side is allowed 30 minutes for argument, including rebuttal. (RM)
May 28, 2019 Filing 134 DECLARATION of Michelle Brane filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 131 Cross MOTION for Modification of the Existing Preliminary Injunction re 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction , 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Kang, Leila)
May 28, 2019 Filing 133 DECLARATION of Allen S. Keller filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 131 Cross MOTION for Modification of the Existing Preliminary Injunction re 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction , 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Kang, Leila)
May 28, 2019 Filing 132 DECLARATION of David Hausman filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 131 Cross MOTION for Modification of the Existing Preliminary Injunction re 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction , 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Kang, Leila)
May 28, 2019 Filing 131 Cross MOTION for Modification of the Existing Preliminary Injunction re 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction , 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/14/2019, (Kang, Leila)
May 20, 2019 Parties Thomas Homan (Acting Director of ICE) and Marc J Moore (Seattle Field Office Director, ICE) terminated per 130 Third Amended Complaint. (MW)
May 20, 2019 Filing 130 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants, filed by Ibis Guzman, Yolany Padilla, Blanca Orantes, Baltazar Vasquez.(Adams, Matt)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 116 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Enforcement of the preliminary injunction entered on April 5 (Dkt. 110 ) is further stayed until July 1, 2019. Defendants' deadline to file a Notice of Appeal with respect to the Order granting Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is extended from June 4, 2019 to July 5, 2019. Discovery is stayed pending consideration of the parties' forthcoming motions. Schedule for Plaintiffs' forthcoming cross- motion to modify the Order granting Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction and Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint is as follows: Plaintiffs' cross-motion to modify due 5/28/2019; Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion due 6/10/2019; Plaintiffs' reply in support of their cross-motion due 6/14/2019; Defendants' motion to dismiss Third Amended Complaint due 6/3/2019; Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' motion due 6/17/2019; Defendants' reply in support of their motion to dismiss due 6/21/2019. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
May 15, 2019 Filing 128 REPLY, filed by Defendants Alex M. Azar, II, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, TO RESPONSE to 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Ramkumar, Archith)
May 13, 2019 Filing 127 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Granting Leave to Plaintiffs to File a Third Amended Complaint, Extending the Time for Implementing the Preliminary Injunction Issued by this Court, Staying Discovery, and Setting a Briefing Schedule for Forthcoming Motions by parties (Ramkumar, Archith)
May 10, 2019 Filing 126 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez, to 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument Requested. (Korthuis, Aaron)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding discovery of electronically stored information. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MW)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER re 121 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael Tan for Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, and Baltazar Vasquez, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER re 120 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Judith Rabinowitz Judy Rabinovitz for Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, and Baltazar Vasquez, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Corrected PHV attorney on 5/8/2019 (DS).
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER re 119 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anand Balakrishnan for Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, and Baltazar Vasquez, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 7, 2019 Filing 121 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael King Tan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5757917 (Adams, Matt)
May 7, 2019 Filing 120 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Judy Rabinovitz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5757903 (Adams, Matt)
May 7, 2019 Filing 119 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anand Balakrishnan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5757888 (Adams, Matt)
May 6, 2019 Filing 118 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by parties (Ramkumar, Archith)
May 3, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2018 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2019, (AR)
May 2, 2019 Filing 116 MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint (redline), # 3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/17/2019, (Kang, Leila)
April 29, 2019 Filing 115 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by parties (Bingham, Lauren)
April 26, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION to Vacate 110 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Defendants Alex M. Azar, II, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Matter of M-S-, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/15/2019, (Ramkumar, Archith)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER re: parties' 111 Stipulated Motion Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Forthcoming Motion to Vacate. April 26, 2019: Deadline for Defendants' Motion to Vacate; May 10, 2019: Deadline for Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Vacate; May 15, 2019: Deadline for Defendants' reply in support of their Motion to Vacate. Compliance with the Preliminary Injunction 110 entered on April 5, 2019, is hereby STAYED until May 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
April 22, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Archith Ramkumar on behalf of Defendants Alex M. Azar, II, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services. (Ramkumar, Archith)
April 22, 2019 Filing 111 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Briefing Deadlines for Motion to Vacate, filed by Defendants William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen M Nielsen, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services. Noting Date 4/22/2019, (Bingham, Lauren)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting plaintiffs' 45 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
April 3, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument on Request for Preliminary Injunction held on 3/26/2019 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nickoline Drury, nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2019, (ND)
April 2, 2019 Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), William P Barr is substituted for United States Attorney General Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III. The docket has been updated. (PM)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *5-10 DAY* Bench Trial is set for 10/19/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 4/25/2019, Proposed ESI order due 4/29/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2019, Completion of fact discovery by 11/20/2019, Completion of expert discovery by 3/19/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/23/2020, Motions due by 4/22/2020, Dispositive motions due by 5/22/2020, Motions in Limine due by 9/14/2020, Pretrial Order due by 10/7/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/7/2020, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 10/7/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
March 26, 2019 Filing 107 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Aaron Korthuis, Leila Kang, Matt Adams; Def Counsel: Lauren Bingham, Brianna Evans; CR: Nicki Drury; Motion Hearing held on 3/26/2019 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Baltazar Vasquez, Blanca Orantes, Ibis Guzman, Yolany Padilla. Oral argument presented. Court will issue order within 14 days. (RM)
March 20, 2019 Filing 106 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5-10. Filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez.(Adams, Matt)
March 19, 2019 Filing 105 NOTIFICATION REGARDING PROPOSED VIDEO RECORDING. All parties have consented to the video recording of the hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction on 3/26/2019 at 3:00 PM. Unless otherwise ordered by the presiding judge, the proceeding will be video recorded as part of the CAMERAS Pilot Project. (RM)
March 13, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Request for Video Recording of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 3/26/2019 at 3:00 PM before Marsha J. Pechman. Parties must submit PARTY RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR VIDEO RECORDING before 3/18/2019. Please Note: This form must not be filed electronically with the Court. (RM)
March 12, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE of Hearing 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : ORAL ARGUMENT/Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Each side is allowed 20 minutes for argument, including rebuttal. (RM)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 37 Amended Motion for Class Certification. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs Padilla, Guzman, Orantes and Vasquez are designated as representatives of the Credible Fear Interview Class; Plaintiffs Orantes and Vasquez as representatives of the Bond Hearing Class; and Plaintiffs' counsel as class counsel. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying Defendants' 83 Motion for Relief from Deadlines. The parties shall submit their Rule 26(f) report within two weeks of the Court's ruling on the pending motion for class certification. (See Dkt. No. 89 .) Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying Defendants' 92 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
February 4, 2019 Filing 99 ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint,, by L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services.(Wilson, Sarah)
January 18, 2019 Filing 98 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez, to 92 MOTION for Reconsideration re 91 Order on Motion to Dismiss, . (Kang, Leila)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting the Government's 93 Motion to extend the answer deadline. The answer deadline in this case is extended until seven days after Congress restores appropriations to the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' 92 MOTION for Reconsideration. Response due 1/18/2019. The 92 Motion for Reconsideration is re-noted for 1/18/2019. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 4, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Kristin Macleod-Ball. Filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. (Macleod-Ball, Kristin)
January 3, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Trina Realmuto. Filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. (Realmuto, Trina) Modified address on 1/3/2019 (DS).
December 26, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendants L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/4/2019, (Wilson, Sarah)
December 26, 2018 Filing 92 MOTION for Reconsideration re 91 Order on Motion to Dismiss, , filed by Defendants L Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/26/2018, (Wilson, Sarah)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 36 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims relating to violations of the Administrative Procedures Act are DISMISSED with prejudice (except as to the claims of the Bond Hearing class for certain procedural safeguards); the motion to dismiss the remainder of Plaintiffs' claims is DENIED. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
November 20, 2018 Filing 90 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Lowell Williams; Pla Counsel: Matt Adams, Leila Kang, Aaron Korthuis, Trina Realmuto (by phone); Def Counsel: Sarah Wilson, Brianna Evans; CR: Andrea Ramirez; Time of Hearing: 1:30 PM; Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2018 re 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Thomas Homan, L. Francis Cissna, US Department of Homeland Security, James Janecka, Marc J Moore, David Shinn, Charles Ingram, Lowell Clark, Kirstjen Nielsen, Executive Office for Immigration Review, US Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K. McAleenan, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services. Court hears argument from counsel and takes matter under advisement. Court advises counsel that its ruling will issue in 14 days. (LW)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding submission of 26(f) report re parties' 88 Stipulated Motion: The parties shall submit their 26(f) within two weeks of Court's ruling on pending motion for certification. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SWT)
November 9, 2018 Filing 88 Joint Stipulated MOTION Regarding 26(f) Report, filed by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services. Noting Date 11/9/2018, (Bingham, Lauren)
November 7, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid for Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
November 7, 2018 Set Oral Argument on 36 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2018 at 1:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
October 26, 2018 Filing 86 RESPONSE, filed by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services, TO REPLY to 83 MOTION for Relief from Deadlines (Bingham, Lauren)
October 26, 2018 Filing 85 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez, TO RESPONSE to 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
October 24, 2018 Filing 84 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez, to 83 MOTION for Relief from Deadlines. (Korthuis, Aaron)
October 18, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION for Relief from Deadlines, filed by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/26/2018, (Bingham, Lauren)
October 17, 2018 Filing 82 RESPONSE, by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services, to 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Wilson, Sarah)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Exchange of Initial Disclosures and Submission of 26(f) Report re parties' 79 Stipulated Motion. The parties shall exchange initial disclosures by November 5, 2018. The parties shall submit their 26(f) report by November 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
October 15, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aaron Korthuis on behalf of Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. (Korthuis, Aaron)
October 11, 2018 Filing 79 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Exchange of Initial Disclosures and Submission of 26(f) report, filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. Noting Date 10/11/2018, (Adams, Matt)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re: parties' 77 Stipulated Motion. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction due 10/17/2018; Plaintiffs' reply due 10/26/2018; Plaintiffs' 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is re-noted for 10/26/2018. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
October 1, 2018 Filing 77 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule, filed by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services. Noting Date 10/1/2018, (Bingham, Lauren)
September 28, 2018 Filing 76 REPLY, filed by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services, TO RESPONSE to 36 MOTION to Dismiss (Wilson, Sarah)
September 28, 2018 Filing 75 Second DECLARATION of Blanca Orantes filed by Plaintiff Blanca Orantes re 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Adams, Matt)
September 28, 2018 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Ibis Guzman filed by Plaintiff Ibis Guzman re 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Adams, Matt)
September 28, 2018 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Yolany Padilla filed by Plaintiff Yolany Padilla re 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Adams, Matt)
September 28, 2018 Filing 72 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez, TO RESPONSE to 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: # 1 Citation Dist. Ct. decision cited to)(Adams, Matt)
September 28, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah S. Wilson on behalf of Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services. (Wilson, Sarah)
September 26, 2018 Filing 70 PRAECIPE re 42 Declaration of Kathrine Russell re: 37 Amended Motion for Class Certification by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Adams, Matt) Modified on 9/27/2018 to add link and language re: amended motion for class certification (PM).
September 24, 2018 Filing 69 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez, to 36 MOTION to Dismiss . Oral Argument Requested. (Kang, Leila)
September 24, 2018 Filing 68 RESPONSE, by Defendants Alex M. Azar, II, L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services, to 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Guzman Bond Order)(Darrow, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 67 DECLARATION of Hilma Torres filed by Defendants Alex M. Azar, II, L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services re 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Darrow, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Joe Neifert filed by Defendants Alex M. Azar, II, L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services re 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Darrow, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 65 DECLARATION of David W. Jennings filed by Defendants Alex M. Azar, II, L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services re 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Darrow, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 64 DECLARATION of John L. Lafferty filed by Defendants Alex M. Azar, II, L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Darrow, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Sidney K. Aki filed by Defendants Alex M. Azar, II, L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Darrow, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Aaron Hull filed by Defendants Alex M. Azar, II, L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United StatesCitizenship and Immigration Services re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Darrow, Joseph)
September 21, 2018 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Baltazar Vasquez filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Edna Yang filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Jocelyn L. Valencia filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Jessica Shulruff Schneider filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Blanca Orantes filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Hilario Mercado, Jr. filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Laura P. Lunn filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Allegra S. Love filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Taylor Levy filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Jennifer Lee Koh filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Jeremy Jong filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Talia Inlender filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Holly S. Cooper filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Anna Byers filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Eduardo Beckett filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Carolina Antonini filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adams, Matt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/12/2018, (Adams, Matt)
September 6, 2018 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Timothy Warden-Hertz filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
September 6, 2018 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Benjamin E. Stein filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
September 6, 2018 Filing 42 DECLARATION of K. Russell filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
September 6, 2018 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Kelly M.L. Rojas filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
September 6, 2018 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Priya A. Patel filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
September 6, 2018 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Carlos Moctezuma Garcia filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
September 6, 2018 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Trina Realmuto filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
September 6, 2018 Filing 37 Amended MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/28/2018, (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
September 6, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Vasquez Bond Order, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/28/2018, (Bingham, Lauren)
September 6, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Joanna Plichta Boisen; Benjamin J Hodges; Kevin Ormiston; William F. Abrams and Thomas Fitzgerald Ahearne for Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. (Hodges, Benjamin)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATON AND ORDER regarding motion briefing schedule re parties' 33 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
September 2, 2018 Filing 33 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Briefing Schedule, filed by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Noting Date 9/4/2018, (Bingham, Lauren)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the parties, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 10/11/2018. All other FRCP 26-related dates are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. After filing of the Second Amended Complaint on August 22, 2018, defendants' motion to dismiss will be due September 5 and noted for September 28. Plaintiffs' response to the motion to dismiss will be due September 24, and defendants' reply will be due September 28. Defendants' response to plaintiffs' pending renoted Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. # 11 ) is due September 17, and plaintiffs' reply is due September 28. (PM)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 28 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristin Macleod-Ball for Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, and Baltazar Vasquez, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 27 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Trina Realmuto for Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, and Baltazar Vasquez, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 22, 2018 Filing 28 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristin Macleod-Ball FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5445053 (Adams, Matt)
August 22, 2018 Filing 27 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Trina Realmuto FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5445052 (Adams, Matt)
August 22, 2018 Filing 26 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against defendant(s) L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James Janecka, filed by Ibis Guzman, Yolany Padilla, Blanca Orantes, Baltazar Vasquez.(Adams, Matt)
August 22, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE Regarding Second Amended Complaint and Stipulation ; filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A & B)(Hodges, Benjamin)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER per parties' 23 Stipulation. IT IS SO ORDERED. After filing of the Second Amended Complaint on August 22, 2018, defendants' motion to dismiss will be due September 5 and noted for September 28. Plaintiffs' response to the motion to dismiss will be due September 24, and defendants' reply will be due September 28. Defendants' response to plaintiffs' pending renoted Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. # 11 ) is due September 17, and plaintiffs' reply is due September 28. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
August 20, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING MOTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE by parties (Hodges, Benjamin)
August 17, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 11 MOTION to Certify Class . Filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. Noting Date 9/28/2018, (Hodges, Benjamin)
August 17, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lauren C. Bingham on behalf of Defendants Alex M. Azar, II, L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Bingham, Lauren)
August 2, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph A. Darrow on behalf of Defendants Alex M. Azar, II, L. Francis Cissna, Lowell Clark, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Thomas Homan, Charles Ingram, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Darrow, Joseph)
July 31, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to EOIR; Jefferson B. Sessions III; Lowell Clark; Charles Ingram; David Shinn on 7/17/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. (Adams, Matt)
July 31, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to US Attorney's Office; ICE; DHS; CBP; USCIS; HHS; ORR; Thomas Homan; Kirstjen Nielsen; Kevin K. McAleenan; L. Francis Cissna; Alex M. Azar II; Scott Lloyd; Marc J. Moore on 6/27/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. (Adams, Matt)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/28/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/4/2018, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
July 30, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 13 Declaration, 14 Declaration, 15 Declaration, 12 Declaration, 11 MOTION to Certify Class (Ahearne, Thomas)
July 30, 2018 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Thomas F. Ahearne filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 11 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Ahearne, Thomas)
July 30, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Matt Adams filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 11 MOTION to Certify Class (Ahearne, Thomas)
July 30, 2018 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Ashleen O'Brien filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 11 MOTION to Certify Class (Ahearne, Thomas)
July 30, 2018 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Glenda M. Aldana Madrid filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez re 11 MOTION to Certify Class (Ahearne, Thomas)
July 30, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/24/2018, (Ahearne, Thomas)
July 17, 2018 Filing 10 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Executive Office for Immigration Review (main document), (Attachments: # 1 Summons Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, # 2 Summons Lowell Clark, # 3 Summons Charles Ingram, # 4 Summons David Shinn)(PM)
July 16, 2018 Filing 9 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 8 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla, Baltazar Vasquez (Attachments: # 1 Summons Executive Office for Immigration Review, # 2 Summons Jefferson Sessions, # 3 Summons Lowell Clark, # 4 Summons Charles Ingram, # 5 Summons David Shinn)(Ahearne, Thomas)
July 16, 2018 Party Baltazar Vasquez as Plaintiff; Executive Office for Immigration Review, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Lowell Clark, Charles Ingram and David Shinn added as defendants per 8 Amended Complaint. (PM)
July 15, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Yolany Padilla.(Ahearne, Thomas)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER clarifying to parties that all pleadings filed before this Court must be in font which is 12 point Times New Roman or larger. Pleadings filed in any other font type will not be accepted. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER reminding parties of the necessity to adhere to the formatting requirements set out in the Local Rules; specifically, the formatting requirements set out in LCR 10(c)(1). Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney William F. Abrams for Plaintiff Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, and Yolany Padilla, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 28, 2018 Attorneys Joanna Plichta,Benjamin J Hodges,and Kevin Ormiston added as counsel for Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, and Yolany Padilla per 3 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
June 27, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY William F. Abrams FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5375032 (Ahearne, Thomas)
June 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas Fitzgerald Ahearne on behalf of Plaintiffs Ibis Guzman, Blanca Orantes, Yolany Padilla. (Ahearne, Thomas)
June 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Alex M. Azar, II, L. Francis Cissna, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons)(ST)
June 25, 2018 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (ST)
June 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Alex M. Azar, II, L. Francis Cissna, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Receipt # 0981-5369615) Attorney Matt Adams added to party Ibis Guzman(pty:pla), Attorney Matt Adams added to party Blanca Orantes(pty:pla), Attorney Matt Adams added to party Yolany Padilla(pty:pla), filed by Ibis Guzman, Yolany Padilla, Blanca Orantes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Azar, # 3 Summons CBP, # 4 Summons Cissna, # 5 Summons DHS, # 6 Summons HHS, # 7 Summons Homan, # 8 Summons ICE, # 9 Summons Lloyd, # 10 Summons McAleenan, # 11 Summons Moore, # 12 Summons Nielsen, # 13 Summons ORR, # 14 Summons USCIS)(Adams, Matt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla et al v. US Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolany Padilla
Represented By: William F. Abrams(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Thomas Fitzgerald Ahearne
Represented By: Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Joanna Plichta Boisen
Represented By: Benjamin J Hodges
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Kevin Ormiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibis Guzman
Represented By: William F. Abrams(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Thomas Fitzgerald Ahearne
Represented By: Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Joanna Plichta Boisen
Represented By: Benjamin J Hodges
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Kevin Ormiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Orantes
Represented By: William F. Abrams(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Thomas Fitzgerald Ahearne
Represented By: Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Joanna Plichta Boisen
Represented By: Benjamin J Hodges
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Kevin Ormiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baltazar Vasquez
Represented By: William F. Abrams
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Thomas Fitzgerald Ahearne
Represented By: Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Joanna Plichta Boisen
Represented By: Benjamin J Hodges
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Kevin Ormiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Refugee Resettlement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc J Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowell Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?