State of Washington et al v. United States Department of State et al Featured Case

A group of state attorneys general have sued the Trump administration asking the court to prohibit a Texas-based company from publishing online the 3D-printing blueprints for several guns. The plaintiff states are Washington, Connecticut, Maryland, New Jersey, New York, Oregon, Massachusetts, Pennsylvania, and Connecticut, and the District of Columbia. The lawsuit seeks declaratory and injunctive relief.

Plaintiff: District of Columbia, State of Maryland, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of New York, State of Connecticut, State of New Jersey, State of Oregon, State of North Carolina, State of Minnesota, State of Vermont, State of Colorado, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Virginia, State of Rhode Island, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii and State of California
Defendant: Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, United States Department of State, Sarah Heidema, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc, Michael R. Pompeo, Conn Williamson, Defense Distributed, Mike Miller and Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety, Electronic Frontier Foundation and The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Interested Party: Benjamin Barber
Case Number: 2:2018cv01115
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 191 RESPONSE by Plaintiff State of Washington re 190 Notice of Supplemental Authority, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Beneski, Kristin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 190 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re 187 Reply to Response to Motion, 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 174 Response to Motion,,,,,, 173 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 188 Reply to Response to Motion, 186 Reply to Response to Motion,, by Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Conn Williamson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flores, Charles)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting parties' 181 Stipulated Motion to Seal the Supplemental Administrative Record. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of court SEAL the supplement to the administrative record, Dkt. No. 179 . It is further ORDERED that all parties in possession of the information identified in the Federal Defendants' clawback letter of April 24, 2019, sequester those documents until any privilege disputes are resolved. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
June 7, 2019 Filing 188 REPLY, filed by Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Conn Williamson, TO RESPONSE to 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit S, # 2 Exhibit T)(Flores, Charles)
June 7, 2019 Filing 187 REPLY, filed by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, US Department of State, TO RESPONSE to 173 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Robinson, Stuart)
May 24, 2019 Filing 186 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 173 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Declaration)(Beneski, Kristin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 185 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Brett Legner for Plaintiff State of Illinois. (Roberson-Young, Elizabeth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE of Filing Revised Supplement to Administrative Record ; filed by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, US Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Shana A. Rogers, # 2 Supplement Part 1, # 3 Supplement Part 2, # 4 Supplement Part 3, # 5 Supplement Part 4, # 6 Supplement Part 5, # 7 Supplement Part 6, # 8 Supplement Part 7, # 9 Supplement Part 8, # 10 Supplement Part 9, # 11 Supplement Part 10, # 12 Supplement Part 11, # 13 Privilege Log - Part 1, # 14 Privilege Log - Part 2)(Soskin, Eric)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION AND ORDER to modify summary judgment briefing schedule re parties' 182 Stipulated Motion. States shall file their combined replies and oppositions to defendants' motions by 5/24/2019. Defendants shall file their replies by 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) Modified docket text on 5/7/2019 to edit typo (SWT).
April 29, 2019 Filing 182 Stipulated MOTION to Modify Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Noting Date 4/29/2019, (Rupert, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2019 Filing 181 Stipulated MOTION to Seal SUPPLEMENT TO ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, US Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shana A. Rogers, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/26/2019, (Robinson, Stuart)
April 19, 2019 Filing 180 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Matthew D Grove for Plaintiff State of Colorado. (Sullivan, Grant)
April 16, 2019 Filing 179 NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENT TO ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND RESPONSE TO MARCH 19, 2019 ORDER ; filed by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, US Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael F. Miller, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Monjay, # 4 Supplement Part 1, # 5 Supplement Part 2, # 6 Supplement Part 3, # 7 Supplement Part 4, # 8 Supplement Part 5, # 9 Supplement Part 6, # 10 Supplement Part 7, # 11 Supplement Part 8, # 12 Supplement Part 9, # 13 Supplement Part 10, # 14 Supplement Part 11, # 15 Supplement Part 12, # 16 Supplement Part 13, # 17 Supplement Part 14, # 18 Supplement Part 15, # 19 Supplement Part 16, # 20 Supplement Part 17, # 21 Supplement Part 18, # 22 Supplement Part 19, # 23 Privilege Log)(Robinson, Stuart)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND ORDER to modify summary judgment briefing schedule re parties; 176 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER denying plaintiffs' 148 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 21, 2019 Filing 176 Stipulated MOTION to Modify Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Noting Date 3/21/2019, (Beneski, Kristin)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting plaintiff states' 132 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 15, 2019 Filing 174 RESPONSE, by Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Conn Williamson, to 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit N, # 20 Exhibit N, # 21 Exhibit N, # 22 Exhibit N, # 23 Exhibit N, # 24 Exhibit N, # 25 Exhibit N, # 26 Exhibit N, # 27 Exhibit N, # 28 Exhibit N, # 29 Exhibit N, # 30 Exhibit N, # 31 Exhibit N, # 32 Exhibit N, # 33 Exhibit N, # 34 Exhibit N, # 35 Exhibit N, # 36 Exhibit N, # 37 Exhibit N, # 38 Exhibit N, # 39 Exhibit N, # 40 Exhibit N, # 41 Exhibit N, # 42 Exhibit N, # 43 Exhibit N, # 44 Exhibit N, # 45 Exhibit N, # 46 Exhibit N, # 47 Exhibit N, # 48 Exhibit N, # 49 Exhibit N, # 50 Exhibit N, # 51 Exhibit N, # 52 Exhibit N, # 53 Exhibit N, # 54 Exhibit N, # 55 Exhibit N, # 56 Exhibit N, # 57 Exhibit N, # 58 Exhibit N, # 59 Exhibit N, # 60 Exhibit N, # 61 Exhibit N, # 62 Exhibit N, # 63 Exhibit N, # 64 Exhibit N, # 65 Exhibit N, # 66 Exhibit N, # 67 Exhibit N, # 68 Exhibit N, # 69 Exhibit N, # 70 Exhibit N, # 71 Exhibit N, # 72 Exhibit N, # 73 Exhibit N, # 74 Exhibit N, # 75 Exhibit N, # 76 Exhibit N, # 77 Exhibit N, # 78 Exhibit N, # 79 Exhibit O, # 80 Exhibit P, # 81 Exhibit Q, # 82 Exhibit R, # 83 Exhibit S, # 84 Exhibit T)(Flores, Charles)
March 15, 2019 Filing 173 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., filed by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, US Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/19/2019, (Robinson, Stuart)
February 15, 2019 Filing 172 DECLARATION of Jennifer D. Williams in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Rupert, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2019 Filing 171 DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski In Support Of Plaintiff States' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-N)(Rupert, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2019 Filing 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/19/2019, (Rupert, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 131 Motion to Stay Proceedings, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
February 6, 2019 Filing 168 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Andrew P Richards for Amicus The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Richards, Andrew)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER re 166 Application. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth Roberson-Young for Plaintiff State of Illinois, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 20, 2019 Filing 166 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth Roberson-Young FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiff State of Illinois Receipt No. 0981-5563317 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
January 17, 2019 Attorney Susan E. Urso terminated; per 165 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Susan E. Urso. ***Motion terminated per direction from Chambers: 165 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Susan E. Urso filed by State of Rhode Island. (SWT)
January 17, 2019 Filing 165 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Susan E. Urso, filed by Plaintiff State of Rhode Island. Noting Date 1/17/2019, (Urso, Susan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE that Joint Settlement Conference has been Held re 115 Order,,, ; filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Beneski, Kristin)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER re 162 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Grant T Sullivan for Plaintiff State of Colorado, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 10, 2019 Filing 162 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Grant T. Sullivan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Colorado (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5608881 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER re 160 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Justin Sullivan for Plaintiff State of Rhode Island, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 9, 2019 Filing 160 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Justin J. Sullivan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Rhode Island (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5606814 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2018 Filing 159 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to 148 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses (Beneski, Kristin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 158 SUPPLEMENT Filing of Materials Identified by Plaintiffs re: 132 Motion to Supp. Record by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification and Declaration of Sarah J. Heidema, # 2 Supplement Supplement Part 1, # 3 Supplement Supplement Part 2, # 4 Supplement Supplement Part 3, # 5 Supplement Supplement Part 4, # 6 Supplement Supplement Part 5, # 7 Supplement Supplement Part 6) (Soskin, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2018 to add link and reference to motion to supplement the record (PM).
December 20, 2018 Filing 157 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to 132 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record (Beneski, Kristin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 156 REPLY, filed by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State, TO RESPONSE to 131 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Publication of Final Agency Rulemaking (Robinson, Stuart)
December 17, 2018 Filing 155 RESPONSE, by Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Conn Williamson, to 148 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Flores, Charles)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER re 153 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey Paul Dunlap for State of Maryland, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 11, 2018 Filing 153 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey Paul Dunlap FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Maryland (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5577290 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2018 Filing 152 RESPONSE, by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State, to 132 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record . (Soskin, Eric)
December 6, 2018 Filing 151 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff State of Washington, to 131 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Publication of Final Agency Rulemaking. (Beneski, Kristin)
December 6, 2018 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric Soskin on behalf of Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State. (Soskin, Eric)
December 4, 2018 RECEIPT of one CD (Exhibit 4) to the Declaration of 149 of Kristin Beneski in support of Plaintiff States' 148 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response; re: 147 Notice of Physical Filing. (CD placed on Clerk's Office filing shelf in one expando folder) (PM)
December 4, 2018 Filing 149 DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski In Support Of Plaintiff States' Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 148 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Beneski, Kristin)
December 4, 2018 Filing 148 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/21/2018, (Beneski, Kristin)
December 4, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE of Filing Disk of Exhibit 4 in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Beneski, Kristin)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER re 144 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brett Legner for Plaintiff State of Illinois, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER re 143 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sripriya Narasimhan for Plaintiff State of North Carolina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 30, 2018 Filing 144 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brett Legner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Illinois (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5563317 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2018 Filing 143 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sripriya Narasimhan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of North Carolina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5563305 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2018 Filing 142 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Joel B. Ard. Filed by Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Conn Williamson. (Ard, Joel) Modified Address on 11/27/2018 (DS).
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER re 139 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nathanael Blake for Plaintiff State of Iowa, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER re 138 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Julia Doyle Bernhardt for Plaintiff State of Maryland, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 21, 2018 Filing 139 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nathanael Blake FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Iowa (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5552801 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2018 Filing 138 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Julia Doyle Bernhardt FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Maryland (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5552414 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER re 136 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan B Miller for Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 136 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan B. Miller FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5550521 (Sprung, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER re 134 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeremy M Feigenbaum for Plaintiff State of New Jersey, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 134 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeremy M. Feigenbaum FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of New Jersey (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5549599 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: re 132 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record . It will be necessary for Assistant Attorneys General Jeff Dunlap, Jeremy Feigenbaum, Jonathan Miller, Brett Legner, Eric Tabor, Sripriya Narasimhan to apply for Pro Hac Vice admission in this case. If you have questions about admission, e-filing, or if you wish to register for training, please contact ECF Support at 1-866-323-9293 or cmecf@wawd.uscourts.gov. (SWT)
November 15, 2018 Filing 133 DECLARATION of Jennifer D. Williams filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 132 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rupert, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2018 Filing 132 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/21/2018, (Rupert, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2018 Filing 131 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Publication of Final Agency Rulemaking, filed by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/21/2018, (Robinson, Stuart)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Conn Williamson's (private defendants) 114 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re 128 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven C Wu for Plaintiff State of New York, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 9, 2018 Filing 128 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven C. Wu FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of New York (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5537982 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Deadline-Related Motions re parties' 126 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 6, 2018 Filing 126 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline to File Discovery-Related Motions, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 11/6/2018, (Beneski, Kristin)
November 2, 2018 Filing 125 REPLY, filed by Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Conn Williamson, TO RESPONSE to 114 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Flores, Charles)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER re 122 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ilona M Kirshon for the State of Delaware, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER re 121 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Patricia Davis for the State of Delaware, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 2, 2018 Filing 122 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ilona M. Kirshon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Delaware (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5529769 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2018 Filing 121 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Patricia Davis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Delaware (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5529750 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2018 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 114 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rupert, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2018 Filing 119 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff State of Washington, to 114 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Rupert, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER re 117 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael J Fischer for Plaintiff The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 24, 2018 Filing 117 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael J. Fischer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Pennsylvania (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5519882 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2018 Filing 116 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Administrative Record Part 1, # 2 Administrative Record Part 2, # 3 Administrative Record Part 3, # 4 Administrative Record Part 4, # 5 Administrative Record Part 5, # 6 Administrative Record Part 6, # 7 Administrative Record Part 7, # 8 Administrative Record Part 8)(Robinson, Stuart)
October 12, 2018 Filing 115 CASE MANAGMENT ORDER - Production of Administrative Record: October 19, 2018; Deadline for amending pleadings: November 5, 2018; Deadline for joining additional parties: November 5, 2018; All motions related to the adequacy of the administrative record or discovery disputes must be filed by November 15, 2018; Settlement conference held no later than January 15, 2019; Plaintiffs shall file a motion for summary judgment of no more than 24 pages by February 15, 2019; Defendants shall file combined oppositions and cross-motions for summary judgment of no more than 24 pages by March 15, 2019; Plaintiffs shall file combined replies and oppositions of no more than 24 pages by April 5, 2019; Defendants shall file replies of no more than 15 pages by April 19, 2019. The cross-motions for summary judgment shall be noted for consideration on the Court's calendar for Friday, April 19, 2019. (KERR)
October 11, 2018 Filing 114 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , filed by Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Conn Williamson. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 11/2/2018, (Flores, Charles)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AGREEMENT re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information AND ORDER re parties' 111 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 9, 2018 Filing 112 ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State.(Myers, Steven)
October 5, 2018 Filing 111 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by parties (Rupert, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2018 Filing 110 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. (Rupert, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Steven A Myers. Filed by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State. (Myers, Steven)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Deadlines re parties' 105 Stipulation: Federal Defendants may file their Answer on or before 10/9/2018, and may file an administrative record on or before 10/19/2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
September 28, 2018 Filing 107 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Ard, Joel)
September 28, 2018 Filing 106 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Defense Distributed (Ard, Joel)
September 27, 2018 NOTE re Document 105 . Appearance of attorney Eric J. Soskin is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with ECF Filing Procedures. This can be corrected by filing a notice of appearance. (SWT)
September 27, 2018 Filing 105 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FEDERAL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINITFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FILE AN ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by parties (Robinson, Stuart)
September 19, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Daniel Hammond for Defendant Defense Distributed. (Flores, Charles)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying Interested Party Benjamin Barber's #99 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Benjamin Barber terminated.) (cc: Benjamin Barber via USPS)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 10/5/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER re #100 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Susan E. Urso for Plaintiff State of Rhode Island, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 5, 2018 Filing 100 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Susan Urso FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Rhode Island (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5459749 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2018 Filing 99 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Interested Party Benjamin Barber. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Brief) Noted by Clerk for 9/14/2018, (SWT)
August 29, 2018 Filing 98 MEMORANDUM filed by Amicus The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence re #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and as granted by Court Order #95 (Kimball, John)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER re #96 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Maura Murphy Osborne for Plaintiff State of Connecticut, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 29, 2018 Filing 96 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Maura Murphy Osborne FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Connecticut (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5452020 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting #43 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
August 23, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 8/21/2018 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Debbie Zurn, debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2018, (DZ)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re #80 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew J Saindon for Plaintiff District of Columbia, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re #79 Application. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jimmy R Rock for Plaintiff District of Columbia, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re #78 Application. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robyn R Bender for Plaintiff District of Columbia, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re #77 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Samuel T Towell for Plaintiff State of Virginia, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re #76 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nelson R Richards for Plaintiff State of California, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re #75 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert T Nakatsuji for Plaintiff State of Hawaii, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re #74 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew D Grove for Plaintiff State of Colorado, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re #73 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan Scott Goldman for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER re #72 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Plaintiff Jacob Campion for State of Minnesota, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 21, 2018 Filing 85 Attorney Jeffrey George Rupert for Plaintiff States of Washington, Connecticut, Maryland, New Jersey, New York, Oregon, Vermont, Colorado, Hawaii, California, District of Columbia, Delaware, Illinois, Iowa, North Carolina, Rhode Island, Minnesota, and Commonwealths of Massachusetts, Pennsylvania, and Virginia added; per #84 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
August 21, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey George Rupert on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2018 Filing 83 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Robert S. Lasnik- Dep Clerk: Kerry Simonds; Pla Counsel: Jeff Rupert, Jeff Sprung, Kristin Beneski, Zachary Jones, Scott Kaplan; Def Counsel: Steven Myers, Charles Flores, Daniel Hammond, Matthew Goldstein, Joel Ard; CR: Debbie Zurn; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 15106; Motion Hearing held on 8/21/2018 re #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. After hearing the arguments of counsel, the Court takes this matter under advisement. An Order shall issue. (KERR)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re #71 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin D Battles for Plaintiff State of Vermont, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 20, 2018 Filing 81 ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Conn Williamson.(Goldstein, Matthew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 80 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew J. Saindon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff District of Columbia (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5441177 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 79 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jimmy R. Rock FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiff District of Columbia Receipt No. 0981-5441102 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 78 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robyn R. Bender FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiff District of Columbia Receipt No. 0981-5441071 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 77 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Samuel T. Towell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Virginia (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5441087 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 76 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nelson R. Richards FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of California (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5441062 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 75 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert T. Nakatsuji FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5441059 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 74 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew D. Grove FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Colorado (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5441047 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 73 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan Scott Goldman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Pennsylvania (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5441043 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 72 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jacob Campion FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Minnesota (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5441033 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 71 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin D. Battles FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Vermont (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5440997 (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #68 Reply to Response to Motion, #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #63 Response to Motion, #64 Response to Motion, by Defendant Conn Williamson (Attachments: #1 Tucson (9th Cir. 1998))(Flores, Charles)
August 17, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE TO FILER re #68 Reply to Response to Motion: The secondary signatures have not been added to the docket. Notices of electronic filing will not be sent until appearances are in compliance with LCR 83.1. (Please see attached) (SWT)
August 17, 2018 Filing 68 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Scott J Kaplan on behalf of Plaintiff State of Oregon. (Kaplan, Scott)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re #59 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kit Walsh for Interested Party Electronic Frontier Foundation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying plaintiff State of Oregon's #57 Motion for Relief from Pro Hac Vice Requirements. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 15, 2018 Filing 65 NOTE re Document #57 . Appearance of attorney Scott Kaplan is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. This can be corrected by filing a notice of appearance. (SWT)
August 15, 2018 Filing 64 RESPONSE, by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State, to #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Heidema Decl.)(Myers, Steven)
August 15, 2018 Filing 63 RESPONSE, by Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Conn Williamson, to #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Goldstein, Matthew)
August 15, 2018 Filing 62 PRAECIPE to attach document Exhibit A re #57 MOTION for Relief from Pro Hac Vice Requirements by Plaintiff State of Oregon (Kaplan, Scott)
August 15, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Venkat Balasubramani on behalf of Interested Party Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
August 15, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Matthew Goldstein. Filed by Defendant Defense Distributed. (Goldstein, Matthew) Modified address on 8/16/2018 (DS).
August 15, 2018 Filing 59 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kit Walsh FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Interested Party Electronic Frontier Foundation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5435645 (Balasubramani, Venkat)
August 15, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, filed by Interested Party Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amicus Brief) Noting Date 8/15/2018, (Balasubramani, Venkat)
August 15, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for Relief from Pro Hac Vice Requirements, filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/24/2018, (Kaplan, Scott)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re #54 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel Hammond for Defendant Defense Distributed, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re #53 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles R. Flores for Defendant Defense Distributed, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 14, 2018 Filing 54 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel N. Hammond FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Conn Williamson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5434042 (Ard, Joel)
August 14, 2018 Filing 53 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles R. Flores FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Conn Williamson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5434028 (Ard, Joel)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying plaintiffs' #34 Motion to Compel Production of Administrative Record, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 13, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven A Myers on behalf of Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State. (Myers, Steven)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re #42 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John D Kimball for The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 10, 2018 Filing 50 NOTE re Document #49 : Appearance of attorney ERIC J. SOSKIN is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (SWT)
August 10, 2018 Filing 49 RESPONSE, by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State, to #34 MOTION to Compel Production of Administrative Record. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart Robinson)(Robinson, Stuart)
August 9, 2018 Filing 48 RESPONSE, by Defendant Defense Distributed, to #34 MOTION to Compel Production of Administrative Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Goldstein, Matthew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, filed by Amicus Everytown for Gun Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - amicus brief of Everytown for Gun Safety, #2 Proposed Order granting motion for leave to file) Noting Date 8/24/2018, (Gupta, Deepak)
August 9, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Amicus The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brief of Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction) Noting Date 8/24/2018, (Richards, Andrew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew P Richards on behalf of Amicus The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Richards, Andrew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Rupert filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-21)(Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Appendix, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/21/2018, (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2018 Filing 42 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John D. Kimball FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5428444 (Richards, Andrew)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re #40 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Deepak Gupta for Amicus Curiae Everytown for Gun Safety, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 9, 2018 Filing 40 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Deepak Gupta FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Everytown for Gun Safety (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5428138 (Terrell, Beth)
August 9, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Beth E Terrell on behalf of Amicus Everytown for Gun Safety. (Terrell, Beth)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RENOTING plaintiffs' #34 MOTION to Compel Production of Administrative Record : Noting Date 8/10/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 8, 2018 Filing 36 NOTIFICATION REGARDING PROPOSED VIDEO RECORDING. All parties have consented to the video recording of the Preliminary Injunction Hearing on 8/21/2018 at 9:00 AM. Unless otherwise ordered by the presiding judge, the proceeding will be video recorded as part of the CAMERAS Pilot Project. (KERR)
August 7, 2018 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Rupert filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #34 MOTION to Compel Production of Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H)(Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION to Compel Production of Administrative Record, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/24/2018, (Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stuart Justin Robinson on behalf of Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State. (Robinson, Stuart)
August 3, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Zachary P Jones on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Jones, Zachary)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RESCHEDULING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING, ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. The preliminary injunction hearing in this matter is rescheduled to Tuesday, August 21, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15106. Plaintiffs' submission in support of a preliminary injunction, if any, shall be filed on or before August 9th; defendants' oppositions shall be filed on or before August 15th; and plaintiffs' reply shall be filed no later than noon on August 17th. The temporary restraining order will remain in effect until August 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
August 2, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE TO FILER re #29 Amended Complaint: The secondary signatures have not been added to the docket. Notices of electronic filing will not be sent until appearances are in compliance with LCR 83.1. (Please see attached) (SWT)
August 2, 2018 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Rupert, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Request for Video Recording Hearing on 8/10/2018 at 9:00 a.m. before Robert S. Lasnik. Parties must submit PARTY RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR VIDEO RECORDING before 8/7/2018. Please Note: This form must not be filed electronically with the Court. (ELS)
August 2, 2018 Filing 27 Please disregard; see Dkt. 28 NOTICE of Request for Video Recording of Hearing set for 8/10/2018 at 9:00 a.m. before Robert S. Lasnik. Parties must submit PARTY RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR VIDEO RECORDING before 8/7/2018. Please Note: This form must not be filed electronically with the Court. (KERR) Modified on 8/2/2018 (KERR).
August 2, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Josh Blackman for Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Conn Williamson. (Ard, Joel)
August 2, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TRO hearing held on 7/31/2018 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nancy Bauer, nancy_bauer@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8506. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2018, (NB)
August 1, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Todd Richard Bowers on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Bowers, Todd)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting plaintiffs' #2 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Pursuant to the limitations set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 65, this matter is hereby set for hearing on Friday, August 10, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15106 to determine whether this temporary restraining order should be converted to a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
July 31, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin Beneski on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Beneski, Kristin)
July 31, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey Todd Sprung on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2018 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Robert S. Lasnik- Dep Clerk: Kerry Simonds; Pla Counsel: Jeff Rupert, Jeff Sprung, Kristin Beneski, Todd Bowers; Def Counsel: Joel Ard, Josh Blackman, Eric Soskin, Tony Coppolino; CR: Nancy Bauer; Time of Hearing: 2:00 p.m.; Courtroom: 15106; Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2018 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by State of Washington. The Court addresses the parties. After hearing the arguments of counsel, and for reasons stated on the record, the Court GRANTS the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and schedules a hearing for 8/10/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. An Order shall issue. (KERR)
July 31, 2018 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
July 31, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff State of Washington re #1 Complaint,, #3 Certificate-Other, #4 Certificate-Other, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Rupert, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff State of Washington re #1 Complaint,, #3 Certificate-Other, #4 Certificate-Other, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Rupert, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE, by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State, to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Soskin, Eric)
July 31, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Bowers, #2 Exhibit A)(Rupert, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2018 Filing 14 LETTER from J. Blackman re subject matter jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ard, Joel)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew Goldstein for Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc, and for Conn Williamson, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Josh Blackman for Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc, and for Conn Williamson, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 31, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE, by Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc, Conn Williamson, to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Ard, Joel)
July 31, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MatthewGoldstein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc, Conn Williamson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5415646 (Ard, Joel)
July 31, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER: As stated in the #9 Notice to Filer, Kristin Beneski, Todd Bowers and Jeff Sprung must file a Notice of Appearance as soon as possible. However, counsel will remain on the docket in order to receive notice of documents filed in the case. (ST)
July 31, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (cc: Kristin Beneski; Todd Bowers; Jeff Sprung) (ST)
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER from Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, and Conn Williamson regarding Motion for TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Ard, Joel)
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All defendant(s) (Main document - Summons United States Department of State) (Attachments: #1 Summons Michael Pompeo, #2 Summons Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, #3 Summons Mike Miller, #4 Summons Sarah Heidema, #5 Summons Defense Distributed, #6 Summons Second Amendment Foundation, #7 Summons Conn Williamson)(CDA)
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Josh Blackman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc, Conn Williamson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5415308 (Ard, Joel)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joel B. Ard on behalf of Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc, Conn Williamson. (Ard, Joel)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SG)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Todd Bowers re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Rupert, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Jeffrey Sprung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Rupert, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/30/2018, (Rupert, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5414989), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons US Department of State, #4 Summons Michael Pompeo, #5 Summons Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, #6 Summons Mike Miller, #7 Summons Sarah Heidema, #8 Summons Defense Distributed, #9 Summons Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., #10 Summons Conn Williamson)(Rupert, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5414989), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons US Department of State, # 4 Summons Michael Pompeo, # 5 Summons Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, # 6 Summons Mike Miller, # 7 Summons Sarah Heidema, # 8 Summons Defense Distributed, # 9 Summons Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., # 10 Summons Conn Williamson)(Rupert, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington et al v. United States Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Represented By: Jimmy R Rock
Represented By: Robyn R Bender
Represented By: Andrew J Saindon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Todd Richard Bowers
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Sprung
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Zachary P Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Represented By: Jonathan Scott Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Represented By: Maura Murphy Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Represented By: Scott J Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Represented By: Jacob Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Represented By: Benjamin D Battles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Represented By: Matthew D Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Iowa
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Virginia
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Represented By: Samuel T Towell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Represented By: Susan E. Urso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Represented By: Robert T Nakatsuji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Jeffrey George Rupert
Represented By: Nelson R Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directorate of Defense Trade Controls
Represented By: Stuart Justin Robinson
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: Stuart Justin Robinson
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Heidema
Represented By: Stuart Justin Robinson
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc
Represented By: Joel B. Ard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Represented By: Stuart Justin Robinson
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conn Williamson
Represented By: Joel B. Ard
Represented By: Josh Blackman
Represented By: Matthew Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Distributed
Represented By: Joel B. Ard
Represented By: Josh Blackman
Represented By: Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Charles R. Flores
Represented By: Daniel Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Miller
Represented By: Stuart Justin Robinson
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Joel B. Ard
Represented By: Josh Blackman
Represented By: Matthew Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Kit Walsh
Represented By: Venkat Balasubramani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By: John D Kimball
Represented By: Andrew P Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Benjamin Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?