Allah v. McAvoy

Plaintiff: Allah and SP
Defendant: Sean F McAvoy
Case Number: 2:2019cv00218
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Referring Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of Sean F McAvoy against Allah. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(ST)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re #4 Report and Recommendation signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation. The complaint is DISMISSED with PREJUDICE. The dismissal shall count as a STRIKE under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g).**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(ST)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT ; filed by Plaintiff Allah. **7 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(ST)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT ; filed by Plaintiff Allah. **7 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(ST)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT ; filed by Plaintiff Allah. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(SG)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: #1 proposed complaint signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Objections to R&R due by 3/12/2019, Noting Date 3/15/2019, (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order to Dismiss, #2 PROPOSED Judgment)**9 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(ST) Modified on 2/20/2019 to add link (MET).
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 3/18/2019 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(ST)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Plaintiff Allah. (NO IFP/NO FILING FEE) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**18 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allah v. McAvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean F McAvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?