Demos v. McConnell et al
Plaintiff: John Robert Demos and John Robert Demos, Jr
Defendant: Mitch McConnell, Nancy Pelosi and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2020cv01785
Filed: December 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 USCA CASE NUMBER 20-36088 for #6 Notice of Appeal, filed by John Robert Demos. **DO NOT PRINT**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(CDA)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit ( 20-36088)re #4 Order on Report and Recommendation, #5 Judgment by Court by Plaintiff John Robert Demos. Filing Fee Not Paid/Received (cc: USCA) **9 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(SG) Modified on 12/18/2020 add CCA # (CDA).
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of John Doe, Mitch McConnell, Nancy Pelosi against John Robert Demos **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. The case is DISMISSED. The #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is STRICKEN. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST)
December 12, 2020 Filing 3 OBJECTIONS to #2 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff John Robert Demos. Noting Date 12/31/2020. **4 3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/14/2020. Plaintiff submitted duplicate objections. The objections with four pages was replaced on the docket.) (ST)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re #1 Proposed Document(s), filed by John Robert Demos. Objections to R&R due by 12/21/2020, Noting Date 12/23/2020, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(SG)
December 5, 2020 Filing 1 PROPOSED Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff John Robert Demos (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account)**19 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demos v. McConnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Robert Demos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Robert Demos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?