Williams et al v. OPVHHJV LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nikki Simon, Michael Williams and Scott Simon
Defendant: David Wood, John and Jane Does 1-100, OPVHHJV LLC Property Manager Landlord doing business as Pathlight Property Management, Ethan Aziz and Home Partners of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00165
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 Mail addressed to Nikki Simon returned as Undeliverable re #5 Order Dismissing Case. (LH)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (VE)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Walter H Olsen, Jr on behalf of Defendants Ethan Aziz, Home Partners of America, OPVHHJV LLC, David Wood. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Olsen, Walter)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $402.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status.- A completed Civil Cover Sheet must be filed. - Signature is missing from the document(s). Please sign as appropriate.- Enclosed is a blank Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, a blank Civil Cover Sheet and the Complaint which is missing signatures. Filer has until 3/12/2021 to correct (CDA)cc plaintiffs via US Mail
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 PROPOSED Complaint filed by Plaintiff Michael Williams (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Email transmittal)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. OPVHHJV LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wood
Represented By: Walter H Olsen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPVHHJV LLC Property Manager Landlord doing business as Pathlight Property Management
Represented By: Walter H Olsen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Aziz
Represented By: Walter H Olsen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Partners of America
Represented By: Walter H Olsen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?