Stepien v. Spinrad et al
Plaintiff: Carol Stepien
Defendant: Mr. Rick Spinrad, Rick Spinrad, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, Gina Raimondo and Department of Commerce
Case Number: 2:2021cv01166
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/12/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/26/2021, Joint Status Report due by 12/3/2021. (KMP)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and referred to Hon. S. Kate Vaughan pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and Amended General Order 02-19. (KMP)
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Department of Commerce, filed by Carol Stepien.(Lim, Nolan)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/22/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan, re: the parties' #5 Joint Stipulation. (TF)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Joint Stipulated MOTION , filed by Defendants National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, Rick Spinrad. Noting Date 10/14/2021, (Fairchild, Katie)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendants National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, Rick Spinrad. (Fairchild, Katie)
October 1, 2021 Party Gina Raimondo added. (TF)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Rick Spinrad, filed by Carol Stepien.(Lim, Nolan)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Rick Spinrad. (RE)
August 31, 2021 Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (RE)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Rick Spinrad, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (Receipt # AWAWDC-7226775) Attorney Nolan Patrick Lim added to party Carol Stepien(pty:pla), filed by Carol Stepien. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lim, Nolan) Modified on 9/2/2021 to add additional defendant filing is against (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stepien v. Spinrad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Stepien
Represented By: Nolan Patrick Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Rick Spinrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Spinrad
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Raimondo
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?