Chaves v. Amazon.com Inc
Plaintiff: Debbie Chaves, Danielle Ward and Amanda Evans
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01213
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Party Amazon.com Services LLC added. Party Amazon.com, Inc. terminated, per the filing of dkt #13 . (SR) Modified on 10/13/2021 (SR) to change date of entry.
October 12, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Brian Buckley on 10/12/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Debbie Chaves, Amanda Evans, Danielle Ward. (Noel, Wright)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Amazon.com Services, LLC (SR)
October 8, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc with JURY DEMAND, filed by Debbie Chaves, Danielle Ward, Amanda Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons)(Noel, Wright)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney L. Timothy Fisher for plaintiff Debbie Chaves, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. (NOTE: additional plaintiffs listed on the application are not currently on the docket)No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Max Stuart Roberts for plaintiff Debbie Chaves, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. (NOTE: additional plaintiffs listed on application are not on the docket at this time) No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY L.Timothy Fisher FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Debbie Chaves (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7266144 (Noel, Wright)
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Max S. Roberts FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Debbie Chaves (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7266101 (Noel, Wright)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Parties' #7 Stipulated Motion Extending Deadlines and Providing Leave to Amend. Plaintiff shall file the proposed First Amended Complaint within fifteen (15) days of the Court's order. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint within forty-five (45) days after date the First Amended Complaint is filed. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SB)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 Joint Stipulated MOTION EXTENDING DEADLINES AND PROVIDING LEAVE TO AMEND, filed by Plaintiff Debbie Chaves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noel, Wright)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/10/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/18/2022, Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2022. (GT)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian D Buckley on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Buckley, Brian)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Lynanne Gares, Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent for Amazon.com, Inc. on 9/15/2021, filed by Plaintiff Debbie Chaves. (Noel, Wright)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Amazon.com Inc (CDA)
September 8, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CDA)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon.com, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7238725), filed by Debbie Chaves. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noel, Wright)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaves v. Amazon.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Chaves
Represented By: Wright A Noel
Represented By: L. Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Max Stuart Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Ward
Represented By: L. Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Max Stuart Roberts
Represented By: Wright A Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Evans
Represented By: L. Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Max Stuart Roberts
Represented By: Wright A Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?