Song et al v. T-Mobile USA Inc
Plaintiff: Linda Song, Rachel Gurley, Andrew Luna, Mario Gordon and Melani Gordon
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01460
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 15 TRANSFERRED CASE opened in Western District of Missouri as case 4:21cv00908 on 12/20/2021. (LH)
December 15, 2021 Filing 14 MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH)
December 15, 2021 Case transferred to the Western District of Missouri by electronic case transfer on 12/15/2021. (LH)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Proceedings pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Proceedings pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7335363 (Koh, Steve)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve)
November 16, 2021 Attorneys Kathleen M O'Sullivan, Lauren Jeffers Tsuji added for T-Mobile USA Inc, per #8 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on T-Mobile USA Inc on 11/3/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Mario Gordon, Melani Gordon, Rachel Gurley, Andrew Luna, Linda Song. (Stephens, Kim)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: This action is reassigned to the Honorable Barbara J. Rothstein because it is related to Case No. CV 21-1118BJR. All pleadings filed in the future shall bear case numbers CV 21-1460BJR. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (SR)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE)
October 28, 2021 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (RE)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-01118 2:21-cv-01119 2:21-cv-01130 2:21-cv-01137 2:21-cv-01138 2:21-cv-01139 2:21-cv-01148 2:21-cv-01148 2:21-cv-01130 2:21-cv-01153 2:21-cv-01157 2:21-cv-01161 2:21-cv-01169 2:21-cv-01179 2:21-cv-01181 2:21-cv-01183 2:21-cv-01189 2:21-cv-01190 2:21-cv-01208 2-21-cv-01321 2-21-cv-01324 2:21-cv-01415, by Plaintiffs Mario Gordon, Melani Gordon, Rachel Gurley, Andrew Luna, Linda Song. (Dennett, Jason)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7309749), filed by Linda Song, Andrew Luna, Mario Gordon, Melani Gordon, Rachel Gurley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dennett, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Song et al v. T-Mobile USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Song
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Kaleigh N.B. Powell
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Gurley
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Kaleigh N.B. Powell
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Luna
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Kaleigh N.B. Powell
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Gordon
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Kaleigh N.B. Powell
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melani Gordon
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Kaleigh N.B. Powell
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Kathleen M O'Sullivan
Represented By: Lauren Jeffers Tsuji
Represented By: Steve Y Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?