Dollson et al v. T-Mobile US Inc et al
Plaintiff: Robin Dollson, Candy Howard and Leonardo Figueroa
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile US Inc and T-Mobile USA Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv00172
Filed: February 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anthony M Christina for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, and Candy Howard by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 13, 2023 Unable to process #9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony M. Christina FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Christina must complete steps for pro hac vice admission via PACER. No further action will be taken at this time. Please contact Attorney Admissions Clerk, Jesse Curry, at 206-370-8439 or WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov with any questions. (Ad Hoc Attorney Christina) (JWC)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Donald Houser for Defendants T-Mobile US Inc and T-Mobile USA Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for Defendants T-Mobile US Inc and T-Mobile USA Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Parties' #23 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Case Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Ruling on the Pending Motion to Transfer. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS)
February 27, 2023 Filing 23 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Case Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistricting Litigation's Ruling on the Pending Motion to Transfer, filed by Defendants T-Mobile US Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc. Noting Date 2/27/2023, (Tsuji, Lauren)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ronald A Marron for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, and Candy Howard by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
February 24, 2023 Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Donald Houser FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants T-Mobile US Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7903138 (Tsuji, Lauren)
February 24, 2023 Filing 20 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants T-Mobile US Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7903130 (Tsuji, Lauren)
February 24, 2023 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by T-Mobile US Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc. (Tsuji, Lauren)
February 24, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lauren Jeffers Tsuji on behalf of Defendants T-Mobile US Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc. (Tsuji, Lauren)
February 10, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion to Transfer MDL to the Western District of Washington re case 2:23-cv-00103-JCC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibits) (LH)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KMP)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christian P Levis for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, and Candy Howard by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Amanda G Fiorilla for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, and Candy Howard by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Margaret C MacLean for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, and Candy Howard by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexis Wood for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, and Candy Howard by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kas Gallucci for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, and Candy Howard by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
February 7, 2023 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christian P. Levis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, Candy Howard (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7880184 (Borde, Manish)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: The case is hereby transferred to the Honorable John C. Coughenour, United States Senior District Judge. The caption for this case shall hereinafter be C23-172 JCC. All scheduled dates will remain as set unless the parties are notified otherwise by John C. Coughenour. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
February 7, 2023 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony M. Christina FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, Candy Howard (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7880171 (Borde, Manish)
February 7, 2023 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amanda G. Fiorilla FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, Candy Howard (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7880162 (Borde, Manish)
February 7, 2023 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Margaret C. MacLean FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, Candy Howard (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7880149 (Borde, Manish)
February 7, 2023 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexis M. Wood FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, Candy Howard (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7880121 (Borde, Manish)
February 7, 2023 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kas L. Gallucci FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, Candy Howard (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7880112 (Borde, Manish)
February 7, 2023 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ronald A. Marron FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, Candy Howard (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7880078 (Borde, Manish)
February 6, 2023 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) T-Mobile US Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons) (CR)
February 6, 2023 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (CR)
February 3, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 23-cv-00103 ; 23-cv-00142, by Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, Candy Howard. (Borde, Manish)
February 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7876332) Attorney Manish Borde added to party Robin Dollson(pty:pla), Attorney Manish Borde added to party Leonardo Figueroa(pty:pla), Attorney Manish Borde added to party Candy Howard(pty:pla), filed by Robin Dollson, Leonardo Figueroa, Candy Howard. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Borde, Manish)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dollson et al v. T-Mobile US Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Dollson
Represented By: Manish Borde
Represented By: Alexis Wood
Represented By: Amanda G Fiorilla
Represented By: Anthony M Christina
Represented By: Christian P Levis
Represented By: Margaret C MacLean
Represented By: Kas Gallucci
Represented By: Ronald A Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Howard
Represented By: Manish Borde
Represented By: Alexis Wood
Represented By: Amanda G Fiorilla
Represented By: Anthony M Christina
Represented By: Christian P Levis
Represented By: Kas Gallucci
Represented By: Ronald A Marron
Represented By: Margaret C MacLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardo Figueroa
Represented By: Manish Borde
Represented By: Amanda G Fiorilla
Represented By: Anthony M Christina
Represented By: Christian P Levis
Represented By: Kas Gallucci
Represented By: Alexis Wood
Represented By: Margaret C MacLean
Represented By: Ronald A Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile US Inc
Represented By: Donald Houser
Represented By: Lauren Jeffers Tsuji
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Represented By: Lauren Jeffers Tsuji
Represented By: Donald Houser
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?