Sorenson v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Norita C Sorenson and Reid S Sorenson
Defendant: Canvas Ct LLC, Cleaver-Brooks Inc, Honeywell International Inc, Howden North America Inc, Joy Global Underground Mining LLC, Milwaukee Valve Company LLC, Morse Tec LLC, OfficeMax Incorporated, Paramount Global, Pneumo Abex LLC, Redco Corporation, Valves and Controls US Inc, WW Henry Company LP, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alaskan Copper Companies Inc, American President Lines LLC, Armstrong International Inc, Aurora Pump Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Burnham LLC, BWDAC Inc, SPX Cooling Technologies LLC, SPX Cooling Technologies Inc, Carrier Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Cole Industrial Inc, Crane Co, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US Inc, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Fryer-Knowles Inc, General Electric Company, Gensco Inc, Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Greene Tweed & Company Inc, Grinnell LLC, Gusmer Enterprises Inc, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Honeywell Inc, Hopeman Brothers Inc, Howden Buffalo Co, IMO Industries Inc, Industrial Service Solutions LLC, International Paper Company, ITT LLC, Jenkins Bros, Johnson Controls Inc, Joy Technologies Inc, Keenan Properties Inc, Lone Star Industries Inc, Luk Clutch Systems LLC, Metalclad Insulation LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Milwaukee Valve Company Inc, Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, Mueller Co LLC, Nibco Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Inc, Boise Cascade Corporation, ViacomCBS Inc, CBS Corporation, Viacom Inc, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Westinghouse Supply Company, The BF Sturtevant Co, Paramount Supply Co, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pfizer Inc, American Brake Shoe Company, American Brake Shoe and Foundry Company, American Brake Materials Corporation, PSF Mechanical Inc, Puget Sound Pipe and Supply Company, Riley Power Inc, Seattle Boiler Works Inc, Spirax Sarco Inc, SPX Flow US LLC, Scott Laboratories Inc, Standard Motor Products Inc, Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc, Superior Boiler Works Inc, Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc, TKD Inc, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc, Atwood & Morrill Valve Company, Velan Valve Corp, Viking Pump Inc, The WW Henry Company, Warren Pumps LLC and York International Corporation
Case Number: 2:2023cv00804
Filed: May 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2023 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney J. Scott Wood on behalf of Defendant Lone Star Industries Inc. (Wood, J.)
June 6, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Zackary Paal on behalf of Defendant Lone Star Industries Inc. (Paal, Zackary)
June 6, 2023 Filing 64 LUK CLUTCH SYSTEMS LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, Attorney Diane Catherine Babbitt added to party Luk Clutch Systems LLC(pty:dft) by Luk Clutch Systems LLC.(Babbitt, Diane)
June 6, 2023 Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Luk Clutch Systems LLC. (Babbitt, Diane)
June 6, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Rachel A Rubin for Defendants Burnham LLC, Flowserve US Inc from July 5, 2023 and July 10-14, 2023. (Rubin, Rachel)
June 6, 2023 Filing 61 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Burnham Holdings, Inc. for Burnham LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Burnham LLC. (Rubin, Rachel)
June 6, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel A Rubin on behalf of Defendant Burnham LLC. (Rubin, Rachel)
June 6, 2023 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Komatsu Mining Corp. for Joy Global Underground Mining LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Joy Global Underground Mining LLC. (Eraut, Allen)
June 6, 2023 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Joy Global Underground Mining LLC.(Eraut, Allen)
June 5, 2023 Attorney Evelyn E Winters added for International Paper Company, per #57 Notice of Appearance (LH)
June 5, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney E. Pennock Gheen, III on behalf of Defendant International Paper Company. (Gheen, E.)
June 5, 2023 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Scott Laboratories Inc. (Roeder, Melissa)
June 5, 2023 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Entrx LLC for Metalclad Insulation LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Hanson, Lorianne)
June 5, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Melissa K. Roeder Yilmaz Evran Turkeri for Defendants Hopeman Brothers Inc, Scott Laboratories Inc from June 7-June 22, 2023. (Turkeri, Yilmaz) Corrected docket text on 6/7/2023 (MJV).
June 5, 2023 Filing 53 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Turkeri, Yilmaz)
June 5, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Melissa K Roeder on behalf of Defendant Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Roeder, Melissa)
June 5, 2023 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Uhle, Megan)
June 5, 2023 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Morse Tec LLC. (Keefe, Patrick)
June 5, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Megan Uhle on behalf of Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Uhle, Megan)
June 5, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patrick S Keefe on behalf of Defendant Morse Tec LLC. (Keefe, Patrick)
June 5, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Melissa K Roeder on behalf of Defendant Scott Laboratories Inc. (Roeder, Melissa)
June 5, 2023 Filing 46 DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, Attorney Diane Catherine Babbitt added to party Honeywell International Inc(pty:dft) by Honeywell International Inc.(Babbitt, Diane)
June 5, 2023 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Honeywell International Inc. (Babbitt, Diane)
June 5, 2023 Filing 44 DEFENDANT GPC's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, Attorney Diane Catherine Babbitt added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft) by Genuine Parts Company.(Babbitt, Diane)
June 5, 2023 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Genuine Parts Company. (Babbitt, Diane)
June 5, 2023 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses by Aurora Pump Company.(Loftis, Jeanne)
June 2, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeanne F Loftis on behalf of Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Loftis, Jeanne)
June 2, 2023 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Howden North America Inc. (Eraut, Allen)
June 2, 2023 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, Attorney Allen Eraut added to party Howden North America Inc(pty:dft) by Howden North America Inc.(Eraut, Allen)
June 2, 2023 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Eraut, Allen)
June 2, 2023 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Warren Pumps LLC.(Eraut, Allen)
June 2, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allen Eraut on behalf of Defendant Joy Global Underground Mining LLC. (Eraut, Allen)
June 2, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher S Marks on behalf of Defendant Spirax Sarco Inc. (Marks, Christopher)
June 2, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher S Marks on behalf of Defendant Paramount Global. (Marks, Christopher)
June 2, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher S Marks on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company. (Marks, Christopher)
June 2, 2023 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Paramount Supply Co.(Morgan, Shaun)
June 2, 2023 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Paramount Supply Co. (Morgan, Shaun)
June 2, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin J Craig on behalf of Defendant PSF Mechanical Inc. (Craig, Kevin)
June 2, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel Casey Dineen on behalf of Plaintiff Norita C Sorenson. (Dineen, Daniel)
June 2, 2023 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dover Corporation for Blackmer Pump Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Blackmer Pump Company. (Clonts, Kevin)
June 2, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin Clonts on behalf of Defendant Blackmer Pump Company. (Clonts, Kevin)
June 1, 2023 Filing 26 DEFENDANT VIKING PUMP, INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, with JURY DEMAND and VIKING PUMP, INC.'S JURY DEMAND by Viking Pump Inc.(Thacker, Todd)
June 1, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Todd M. Thacker on behalf of Defendant Viking Pump Inc. (Thacker, Todd)
June 1, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant Greene Tweed & Company Inc. (Odom, Jeffrey)
June 1, 2023 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent TWG Investments (No. 8) Limited for Valves and Controls US Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Valves and Controls US Inc. (Kopij, Dana)
June 1, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dana C Kopij on behalf of Defendant Valves and Controls US Inc. (Kopij, Dana)
June 1, 2023 Filing 21 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Flowserve US Inc. (Rubin, Rachel)
June 1, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel A Rubin on behalf of Defendant Flowserve US Inc. (Rubin, Rachel)
June 1, 2023 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. for O'Reilly Automotive Stores Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by O'Reilly Automotive Stores Inc. (Leatham, Stephen)
June 1, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephen Garrett Leatham on behalf of Defendant O'Reilly Automotive Stores Inc. (Leatham, Stephen)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
June 1, 2023 Filing 15 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted federal court jury demand on file (CR)
June 1, 2023 Judge Lauren King added. (CR)
June 1, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), DEFENDANT(S) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/8/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (CR)
May 31, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Diane Catherine Babbitt on behalf of Defendant Honeywell International Inc. (Babbitt, Diane)
May 31, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Odom, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant Puget Sound Pipe and Supply Company. (Odom, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant OfficeMax Incorporated. (Odom, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant Luk Clutch Systems LLC. (Odom, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant Superior Boiler Works Inc. (Odom, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Pfizer Inc. (Todaro, Anthony)
May 31, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anthony Todaro on behalf of Defendant Pfizer Inc. (Todaro, Anthony)
May 31, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney G William Shaw on behalf of Defendant Redco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement)(Shaw, G)
May 31, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Eversole, Sarah)
May 31, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah)
May 31, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah L Eversole on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah)
May 31, 2023 Filing 2 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Bernhardt, R)
May 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 23-2-08173-1; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8027536) filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Service, #3 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum to Puget Sound Commerce Center LLC, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of J. Thomas Schroppe, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bernhardt, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorenson v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canvas Ct LLC
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Maxwell A Wesemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Inc
Represented By: Marisa Berlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Represented By: Cassandra Ekure
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Represented By: Carinne Bannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howden North America Inc
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Global Underground Mining LLC
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Gannon Crisera
Represented By: Patrick S Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OfficeMax Incorporated
Represented By: Cassandra Ekure
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Represented By: Jean Y Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: G William Shaw
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valves and Controls US Inc
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WW Henry Company LP
Represented By: Carinne Bannan
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaskan Copper Companies Inc
Represented By: G William Shaw
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American President Lines LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Lucy Boateng-Agyei
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Represented By: Justin Leslie Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Represented By: Kevin Clonts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham LLC
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWDAC Inc
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Represented By: Jason H Daywitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Cooling Technologies LLC
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Maxwell A Wesemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Cooling Technologies Inc
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Maxwell A Wesemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Marisa Berlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks
Represented By: Marisa Berlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Industrial Inc
Represented By: Marisa Berlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: G William Shaw
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowley Maritime Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer-Knowles Inc
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gensco Inc
Represented By: Jeff Bone
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Represented By: Cassandra Ekure
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Incorporated
Represented By: Marisa Berlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Company Inc
Represented By: Cassandra Ekure
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Marisa Berlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gusmer Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Daira S Waldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Represented By: Cassandra Ekure
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Represented By: Carinne Bannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc
Represented By: Yilmaz Evran Turkeri
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howden Buffalo Co
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Service Solutions LLC
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Evelyn E Winters
Represented By: E. Pennock Gheen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Marisa Berlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins Bros
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc
Represented By: Marisa Berlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Technologies Inc
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keenan Properties Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Industries Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Zackary Paal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luk Clutch Systems LLC
Represented By: Cassandra Ekure
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Ryan James Roberts
Represented By: Lorianne Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah L Eversole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Patrick S Keefe
Represented By: Jennifer Gannon Crisera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mueller Co LLC
Represented By: John G Goller
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nibco Inc
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores Inc
Represented By: Stephen Garrett Leatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boise Cascade Corporation
Represented By: Cassandra Ekure
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Supply Company
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The BF Sturtevant Co
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Supply Co
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Nicole R. MacKenzie
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Adam DeSipio
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Represented By: Stephen H Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Brake Shoe Company
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Represented By: Jean Y Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Brake Shoe and Foundry Company
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Represented By: Jean Y Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Brake Materials Corporation
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Represented By: Jean Y Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSF Mechanical Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Pipe and Supply Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Represented By: Cassandra Ekure
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power Inc
Represented By: David A Shaw
Represented By: Tyler J Hermsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Boiler Works Inc
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco Inc
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Flow US LLC
Represented By: Lorianne Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc
Represented By: Howard (Terry) I. Hall
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Virginia Leeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Boiler Works Inc
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Represented By: Cassandra Ekure
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Virginia Leeper
Represented By: Zackary Paal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TKD Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Valve Company
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump Inc
Represented By: Todd M. Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The WW Henry Company
Represented By: Carinne Bannan
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Marisa Berlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norita C Sorenson
Represented By: Meredith B Good
Represented By: Daniel Casey Dineen
Represented By: John Louis Steffan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reid S Sorenson
Represented By: Meredith B Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?