Vale et al v. City of Seattle et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery Vale, Andy Barber, Andrew Pittman, Andrew Stewart, Andrew Young, Ann-Maree Tedaldi, Branon Snyder, Brent Mattila, Brian Paterik, Darrin Quaschnik, David Dahlin, Dennis Stanley, Else Hiemestra, Emmanuel Hearne, Erik Sadlon, Erik Gochnour, Ian Condon, James O'Connell, Jason Overstreet, Jesse Gorham, John Cizin, Joseph Hickey, Joseph Toche, Joshua Gibbs, Joshua Schaapveld, Kenneth Whitehair, Lance Fisher, Mark Nelson, Michael Peterson, Michael Todd, Peter Denton, Rob Kilcup, Steven Collins, Steven Ericson, Theresa Macmillan, Tom Newman, Wayne Johnson and Zero Iaulualo
Defendant: City of Seattle, Harold Scoggins, Andrew Lu, Sarah Lee and Jenny Durkan
Case Number: 2:2023cv01095
Filed: July 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT CITY OF SEATTLE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (Dkt. #17 ). Deadline for City of Seattle to answer is extended to 9/25/2023. Signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke.(AMD)
September 7, 2023 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , filed by Defendant City of Seattle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/8/2023, (Kazaryan, Emma)
September 7, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Harold Scoggins mailed on 8/14/2023 (Arnold, Nathan)
September 7, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Andrew Lu mailed on 8/14/2023 (Arnold, Nathan)
September 7, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Sarah Lee mailed on 8/14/2023 (Arnold, Nathan)
September 7, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jenny Durkan mailed on 8/14/2023 (Arnold, Nathan)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lynn A Kappelman for DEFENDANT City of Seattle by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
August 21, 2023 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lynn A. Kappelman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant City of Seattle (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8132046 (Parris Watts, Lauren)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. City of Seattle answer deadline is extended to 9/11/2023. (GMR)
August 15, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on City of Seattle on 7/24/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Arnold, Nathan)
August 14, 2023 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , filed by Defendant City of Seattle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/14/2023, (Parris Watts, Lauren)
August 9, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emma J Kazaryan on behalf of Defendant City of Seattle. (Kazaryan, Emma)
August 9, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kira Jesica Johal on behalf of Defendant City of Seattle. (Johal, Kira)
August 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lauren D Parris Watts on behalf of Defendant City of Seattle. (Parris Watts, Lauren)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/10/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/16/2023, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
July 21, 2023 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) City of Seattle, Jenny Durkan, Sarah Lee, Andrew Lu, Harold Scoggins (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (MG)
July 21, 2023 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (MG)
July 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8094842) Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Andy Barber(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party John Cizin(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Steven Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Ian Condon(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party David Dahlin(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Peter Denton(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Steven Ericson(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Lance Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Joshua Gibbs(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Erik Gochnour(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Jesse Gorham(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Emmanuel Hearne(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Joseph Hickey(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Else Hiemestra(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Zero Iaulualo(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Wayne Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Rob Kilcup(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Theresa Macmillan(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Brent Mattila(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Mark Nelson(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Tom Newman(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party James O'Connell(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Jason Overstreet(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Brian Paterik(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Michael Peterson(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Andrew Pittman(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Darrin Quaschnik(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Erik Sadlon(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Joshua Schaapveld(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Branon Snyder(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Dennis Stanley(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Andrew Stewart(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Ann-Maree Tedaldi(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Joseph Toche(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Michael Todd(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Jeffery Vale(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Kenneth Whitehair(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Andrew Young(pty:pla) filed by Rob Kilcup, Steven Collins, John Cizin, Branon Snyder, Kenneth Whitehair, Ian Condon, Andy Barber, Jeffery Vale, James O'Connell, Michael Todd, Erik Gochnour, Joshua Schaapveld, Lance Fisher, Mark Nelson, Jesse Gorham, Emmanuel Hearne, Joshua Gibbs, Darrin Quaschnik, Peter Denton, Theresa Macmillan, David Dahlin, Joseph Hickey, Joseph Toche, Else Hiemestra, Michael Peterson, Ann-Maree Tedaldi, Tom Newman, Andrew Pittman, Brian Paterik, Dennis Stanley, Erik Sadlon, Zero Iaulualo, Brent Mattila, Andrew Stewart, Steven Ericson, Wayne Johnson, Jason Overstreet, Andrew Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit AB, #29 Exhibit AC, #30 Exhibit AD, #31 Exhibit AE, #32 Exhibit AF, #33 Exhibit AG, #34 Exhibit AH, #35 Exhibit AI, #36 Exhibit AJ, #37 Exhibit AK, #38 Exhibit AL, #39 Exhibit AM, #40 Exhibit AN, #41 Exhibit AO, #42 Exhibit AP, #43 Exhibit AQ, #44 Exhibit AR, #45 Exhibit AS, #46 Exhibit AT, #47 Exhibit AU, #48 Exhibit AV, #49 Exhibit AW, #50 Exhibit AX, #51 Exhibit AY, #52 Exhibit AZ, #53 Exhibit BA, #54 Exhibit BB, #55 Exhibit BC, #56 Exhibit BD, #57 Exhibit BE, #58 Exhibit BF, #59 Exhibit BG, #60 Exhibit BH, #61 Exhibit BI, #62 Exhibit BJ, #63 Exhibit BK, #64 Exhibit BL, #65 Exhibit BM, #66 Exhibit BN, #67 Exhibit BO, #68 Exhibit BP, #69 Exhibit BQ, #70 Exhibit BR, #71 Exhibit BS, #72 Exhibit BT, #73 Exhibit BU, #74 Exhibit BV, #75 Exhibit BW, #76 Exhibit BX, #77 Exhibit BY, #78 Exhibit BZ, #79 Exhibit CA, #80 Exhibit CB, #81 Exhibit CC, #82 Exhibit CD, #83 Exhibit CE, #84 Exhibit CF, #85 Exhibit CG, #86 Exhibit CH, #87 Exhibit CI, #88 Exhibit CJ, #89 Exhibit CK, #90 Exhibit CL, #91 Exhibit CM, #92 Exhibit CN, #93 Exhibit CO, #94 Exhibit CP, #95 Exhibit CQ, #96 Exhibit CR, #97 Exhibit CS, #98 Exhibit CT, #99 Exhibit CU, #100 Exhibit CV, #101 Exhibit CW, #102 Exhibit CX, #103 Exhibit CY, #104 Exhibit CZ, #105 Exhibit DA, #106 Exhibit DB, #107 Civil Cover Sheet, #108 Summons City of Seattle, #109 Summons Harold Scoggins, #110 Summons Andrew Lu, #111 Summons Sarah Lee, #112 Summons Jenny Durkan)(Arnold, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vale et al v. City of Seattle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Vale
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Barber
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Pittman
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Stewart
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Young
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann-Maree Tedaldi
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branon Snyder
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Mattila
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Paterik
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin Quaschnik
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dahlin
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Stanley
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Else Hiemestra
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Hearne
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Sadlon
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Gochnour
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Condon
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O'Connell
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Overstreet
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Gorham
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cizin
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Hickey
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Toche
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Gibbs
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Schaapveld
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Whitehair
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Fisher
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Nelson
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Peterson
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Todd
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Denton
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Kilcup
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Collins
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ericson
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Macmillan
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Newman
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Johnson
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zero Iaulualo
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Represented By: Emma J Kazaryan
Represented By: Kira Jesica Johal
Represented By: Lauren D Parris Watts
Represented By: Lynn A Kappelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Scoggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Durkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?